Vadella et al v. American States Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Ann Vadella and Joseph J. Vadella
Defendant: American States Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00073
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE by Ann Vadella, Joseph J. Vadella to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #4 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Munley, Thomas)
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #4 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ann Vadella, Joseph J. Vadella. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Munley, Thomas)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall have an extension of time until 3/11/19 to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 2/20/19 (jam)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Ann Vadella, Joseph J. Vadella. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Concurrence)(Munley, Thomas)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT Motion to Dismiss Bad Faith Claim re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by American States Insurance Company.(Foster, William)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by American States Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Foster, William)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by American States Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Memo Brief in Support of Motion)(Foster, William)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 1/14/19. (jam)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBITS by American States Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (ao)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American States Insurance Company from Court of Common Pleas of Lackawanna County, case number 2018-CV-4671. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-4645387), filed by American States Insurance Company.(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vadella et al v. American States Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Vadella
Represented By: Thomas W. Munley
Represented By: Jason J. Mattioli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph J. Vadella
Represented By: Thomas W. Munley
Represented By: Jason J. Mattioli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American States Insurance Company
Represented By: William C. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?