Lupton v. Walmart Stores East, LP

Plaintiff: Cynthia Lupton
Defendant: Walmart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 3:2019cv00077
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 3/28/2019 11:00 AM before Honorable Malachy E Mannion.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 2/27/19. (bs)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from All Counsel Requesting Coordinated Case Management Conference. (Winebrake, Peter)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Cynthia Lupton. Walmart Stores East, LP waiver sent on 1/17/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Chivers, Joseph)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 1/22/19. (bs)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Walmart Stores East, LP and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (lh)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Walmart Stores East, LP ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4645977), filed by Cynthia Lupton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lupton v. Walmart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Lupton
Represented By: Joseph H. Chivers
Represented By: Peter Winebrake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?