Davis-Hinkle v. Khodzhayeva-Mariano et al

Plaintiff: Lola Davis-Hinkle
Defendant: Carol Palko and Anna Khodzhayeva-Mariano
Case Number: 3:2019cv00104
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: James M Munley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Peter C. Wood, Jr. . (Wood, Peter)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Lola Davis-Hinkle. Anna Khodzhayeva-Mariano waiver sent on 1/17/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; Anna Khodzhayeva-Mariano(t/d/b/a Modern Smile) waiver sent on 1/17/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; Carol Palko waiver sent on 1/17/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Wood, Peter)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a Status Report re Service within 10 days.Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 3/8/2019. (bg)
January 17, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Judge Munley. (rw)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Anna Khodzhayeva-Mariano, Anna Khodzhayeva-Mariano(t/d/b/a Modern Smile), Carol Palko and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (bg)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anna Khodzhayeva-Mariano, Anna Khodzhayeva-Mariano(t/d/b/a Modern Smile), Carol Palko ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4649815), filed by Lola Davis-Hinkle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis-Hinkle v. Khodzhayeva-Mariano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Palko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Khodzhayeva-Mariano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lola Davis-Hinkle
Represented By: Bruce K. Anders
Represented By: Robert A. Anders
Represented By: Peter C Wood, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?