JCS Logistics, Inc. v. Brooks

Plaintiff: JCS Logistics, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: James Brooks
3Rd Party Defendant: Michael J. Carty
Case Number: 3:2019cv00204
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: A Richard Caputo
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven E Hoffman (Hoffman, Steven)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION by Michael J. Carty, JCS Logistics, Inc.. (Hoffman, Steven)
March 15, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER - #2 Praecipe for Withdrawal of the Notice of Removal construed as a motion to remand is DENIED. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 3/15/19. (dw)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Praecipe for Withdrawal of Notice of Removal . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of Service)(Bhaskar, Raajen)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by James Brooks from Carbon County, case number 18-2384. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 4666710), filed by James Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) County Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #3 Civil Cover Sheet 2)(bg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JCS Logistics, Inc. v. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: James Brooks
Represented By: Raajen V. Bhaskar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Michael J. Carty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JCS Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Steven E Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?