Bank Capital Services LLC v. ZVI Bloom

Plaintiff: Bank Capital Services LLC
Defendant: ZVI Bloom
Case Number: 3:2019cv00276
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ZVI Bloom for failure to answer or otherwise plead.Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/2/19. (bs)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bank Capital Services LLC. ZVI Bloom served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019. (Klein, Jonathan)
April 1, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: In order that ECF may create and satisfy automatically-generated Service and Answer deadlines, Doc. #6 in the above-captioned case should be re-filed using the proper event, "Summons Returned Executed" found in the category, "Service of Process" under the heading, "Initial Pleadings and Service".For toll-free ECF telephone support, you may call the divisionaloffice nearest to you during regular business hours:Scranton: 866-263-8479Harrisburg: 866-333-3261Williamsport: 866-736-3914 Ed PetroskiDeputy Clerk (ep)
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Bank Capital Services LLC. (Klein, Jonathan)
March 15, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Zvi Bloom on 03/01/2019, filed by Bank Capital Services LLC. (Klein, Jonathan)
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Nola Bencze.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 3/14/19. (bs)
March 13, 2019 Filing 4 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Nola R. Bencze on behalf of Bank Capital Services LLC Attorney Nola R. Bencze is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4700520.. (Bencze, Nola)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 2/25/19. (bs)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ZVI Bloom and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ga)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ZVI Bloom ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4676863), filed by Bank Capital Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C)(ga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank Capital Services LLC v. ZVI Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZVI Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank Capital Services LLC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Klein
Represented By: Nola R. Bencze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?