Briggs v. Brockman et al
Plaintiff: Simeon Joel Briggs
Defendant: Rachel Eigenbrode, A. Brockman, Jennifer Enigkt and Jennifer Enigk
Case Number: 3:2019cv00319
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: DB
Referring Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Copy of docket sheet sent to Briggs highlighting where Order Dismissing IFP Motions were dismissed as they were duplicative (and explaining that the previously GRANTED IFP motion was still in effect in the case). (ep)
April 18, 2019 Filing 23 Letter dated 4-13-19 from Simeon Joel Briggs inquiring how his application for ifp was dismissed; also inquiring about his habeas corpus petition; (ep)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER dismissing #14 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; dismissing #19 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as duplicative.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 4/8/19 (bs)
April 8, 2019 Filing 21 Letter dated 4/4/19 from Simeon Briggs inquiring if he's on the calendar for a court date of 4/17/19, as this is the date he filed for. (ep)
April 8, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned A. Brockman waiver sent on 3/15/2019, answer due 5/14/2019; Rachel Eigenbrode waiver sent on 3/15/2019, answer due 5/14/2019; Jennifer Enigk waiver sent on 3/15/2019, answer due 5/14/2019. (ep)
April 2, 2019 Receipt of payment from SIMEON BRIGGS in the amount of $18.41 for PLRA CIVIL FILING FEE. Transaction posted on 4/1/2019. Receipt number 333065093 processed by aoswald. (jjs, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Simeon Joel Briggs.(ep)
March 22, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Appoint private investigator by Simeon Joel Briggs. Pltf also asks to be moved to another facility until these proceedings are final, in fear of retaliation and/or harassment and having his paperwork regarding this case taken.(ep)
March 22, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST for court date to be set for 4-17-19 and for blank Habeas Corpus (2255) forms by Simeon Joel Briggs. (forms sent to Briggs) (ep)
March 20, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Docket parties updated to reflect correction to Deft. Enigk's last name; (ep)
March 20, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Simeon Joel Briggs that he mailed ifp forms with account sheet and that Deft name is spelled incorrectly (should be Jennifer Enigk); (ep)
March 20, 2019 Filing 15 U.S. MARSHAL - 285, AO 398 and AO 399 Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (ep)
March 20, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Simeon Joel Briggs.(ep)
March 15, 2019 Filing 13 Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399), AO 85 Notice and Consent Form with copy of Waiver Order and Complaint Mailed to Supervisor Atty Jonathan Kerr for A. Brockman, Rachel Eigenbrode, Jennifer Enigkt Waiver of Service due by 4/15/2019. Copy of Waiver Order, Complaint and all Defts' waiver forms also mailed to U.S. Atty and U.S. Atty General Wash DC;(ep)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants and copy of this Order on Superintendent/Warden ; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperisSigned by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 03/15/19. (ep)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #7 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 3/14/19 (bs)
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Simeon Joel Briggs. (ep)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 Letter dated 3/4/19 from Simeon Briggs explaining that he'd never be able to get opposing parties to sign AO 85 form, explaining as well that he'd previously sent an inmate account statement and that he would like someone appointed to assist him in this matter, as there shouldn't be a reason why his mail isn't making it to the courts; (ep)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Simeon Joel Briggs.(ep)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Simeon Joel Briggs and request for copy of Pltf's Procedural Background; (ep)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 02/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 PRO SE LETTER and STANDING PRACTICE ORDER issued; (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent Form)(ep)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 U.S. MARSHAL - 285, AO 398 and AO 399 Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (ep)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Simeon Joel Briggs. (ep)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Simeon Joel Briggs.(ep)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A. Brockman, Rachel Eigenbrode, Jennifer Enigkt, LODGED WITH MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Simeon Joel Briggs.(ep) Modified on 3/7/2019 (ep).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Briggs v. Brockman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simeon Joel Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Eigenbrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Brockman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Enigkt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Enigk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?