Martinez v. Liberty Mutual Insurance
Plaintiff: Julizza Martinez
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance
Case Number: 3:2019cv00331
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Civil case terminated per voluntary dismissal. (bs)
April 10, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Julizza Martinez WITHOUT PREJUDICE (MCGINTY-FERRIS, MARIA)
April 3, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Julizza Martinez ON LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE (Ferris, Bryan)
March 29, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon A Swartz on behalf of Julizza Martinez (Swartz, Brandon)
March 29, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of Motion to Dismiss Count II (Bad Faith) of Plaintiff's Complaint re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Count II (Bad Faith) of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Schenck, Edward)
March 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Count II (Bad Faith) of Plaintiff's Complaint by Liberty Mutual Insurance.(Schenck, Edward)
March 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by MARIA K MCGINTY-FERRIS on behalf of Julizza Martinez (MCGINTY-FERRIS, MARIA)
March 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A. Schenck on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance (Schenck, Edward)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Maria McGinty-Ferris.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 3/18/19. (bs)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Brandon Swartz.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 3/18/19. (bs)
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Bryan M. Ferris on behalf of Julizza Martinez Attorney Maria K. McGinty-Ferris is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4704465., filed by on behalf of Julizza Martinez.(Ferris, Bryan)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Bryan M. Ferris on behalf of Julizza Martinez Attorney Brandon A. Swartz is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4704463., filed by on behalf of Julizza Martinez.(Ferris, Bryan)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - Attorney MARIA K MCGINTY-FERRIS terminated on behalf of Julizza Martinez. (Ferris, Bryan)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 3/1/19. (bs)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - Attorney Brandon A Swartz terminated on behalf of Julizza Martinez. (Ferris, Bryan)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Liberty Mutual Insurance and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ga)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liberty Mutual Insurance ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4685774), filed by Julizza Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Liberty Mutual Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance
Represented By: Edward A. Schenck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julizza Martinez
Represented By: Brandon A Swartz
Represented By: MARIA K MCGINTY-FERRIS
Represented By: Bryan M. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?