Pupa v. National Casualty Company
Plaintiff: William Pupa
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company and National Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00332
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order approving re #11 Stipulation to Amend Caption. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 4/3/19. (jam)
April 2, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION TO AMEND CAPTION TO CORRECT THE IDENTITY OF THE DEFENDANT by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Vance, Bradley)
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 Deendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company.(Vance, Bradley)
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Brandon A. Swartz, Esq.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 3/26/19. (jam)
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Maria K. McGinty-Ferris, Esq.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 3/26/19. (jam)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Bryan M. Ferris on behalf of William Pupa Attorney Maria K. McGinty-Ferris is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4712888., filed by on behalf of William Pupa.(Ferris, Bryan)
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Bryan M. Ferris on behalf of William Pupa Attorney Brandon A. Swartz is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4712876., filed by on behalf of William Pupa.(Ferris, Bryan)
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Vance, Bradley)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 3/21/19. (jam)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley J. Vance on behalf of Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Concurrence Certificate of Service)(Vance, Bradley)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (bg)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4685930), filed by William Pupa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pupa v. National Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Casualty Company
Represented By: Bradley J. Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Pupa
Represented By: Bryan M. Ferris
Represented By: MARIA K MCGINTY-FERRIS
Represented By: Brandon A Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?