FITZGERLAD v. WAL-MART STORES EAST, L.P.

Plaintiff: Alma Fitzgerlad
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00506
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: A Richard Caputo
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case assigned to Judge Caputo. (aaa)
March 21, 2019 Filing 14 Case electronically transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-05252.
March 18, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT ORDER TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(A). SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 3/18/19. 3/19/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/21/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Consent Order by WAL-MART STORES EAST, L.P. to Transfer Venue. (ZANGRILLI, NANCY) (COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)Modified on 3/15/2019 (md). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/21/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED THAT THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 18, 2019 HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED TO APRIL 1, 2019 AT 2:00 PM BEFORE THE HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT.(kf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/21/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON MONDAY, MARCH 18, 2019 AT 2:00 P.M., VIA TELEPHONE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 2/27/19. 2/27/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/21/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 Cancellation of Arbitration Hearing (ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/21/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 Arbitration Certification that case exceeds the sum of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs (TOMLINSON, TYLER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/21/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure by ALMA FITZGERLAD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(TOMLINSON, TYLER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/21/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/21/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK J. MCDONNELL on behalf of WAL-MART STORES EAST, L.P. with Certificate of Service(MCDONNELL, PATRICK) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/21/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 5/1/2019 09:30 AM IN Philadelphia.(ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/21/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint together with New Matter by WAL-MART STORES EAST, L.P..(ZANGRILLI, NANCY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/21/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent WALMART INC. for WAL-MART STORES EAST, L.P.. by WAL-MART STORES EAST, L.P..(sg, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/21/2019.]
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WAL-MART STORES EAST, L.P. from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, case number 180801178. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 188954)(sg, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2018: #1 EXHIBIT A, #2 EXHIBIT B, #3 EXHIBIT C, #4 EXHIBIT D, #5 EXHIBIT E, #6 DESIGNATION FORM, #7 TRACK FORM, #8 CIVIL COVER SHEET) (sg, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/21/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FITZGERLAD v. WAL-MART STORES EAST, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
Represented By: Nancy Elizabeth Zangrilli
Represented By: Patrick J. McDonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma Fitzgerlad
Represented By: R. Tyler Tomlinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?