Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. LAKESIDE RESTAURANT, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., PWMP ACQUISITION I LLC, Springtime Music, Inc., EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, HOT-CHA MUSIC CO., HOLLENBECK MUSIC, Songs of Universal, Inc., MARY BONO, THREE WISE BOYS MUSIC, LLC, REGENT MUSIC CORPORATION,, Fourteenth Hour Music Inc., Unichappell Music Inc. and Cotillion Music, Inc.
Defendant: LAKESIDE RESTAURANT, LLC and Henry CALLIE
Case Number: 3:2019cv00975
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Henry CALLIE, LAKESIDE RESTAURANT, LLC for failure to answer or otherwise plead; (ep)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Broadcast Music, Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC., Fourteenth Hour Music Inc., HOLLENBECK MUSIC, HOT-CHA MUSIC CO., MARY BONO, PWMP ACQUISITION I LLC, REGENT MUSIC CORPORATION,, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Springtime Music, Inc., THREE WISE BOYS MUSIC, LLC, Unichappell Music Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Kenneth J. McDermott, Esquire, in Support of Plaintiffs' Request for Default, #2 Proposed Order Default)(McDermott, Ken)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Unichappell Music Inc., EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC., Broadcast Music, Inc., Springtime Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., MARY BONO, PWMP ACQUISITION I LLC, Fourteenth Hour Music Inc., REGENT MUSIC CORPORATION,, HOLLENBECK MUSIC, THREE WISE BOYS MUSIC, LLC, HOT-CHA MUSIC CO., Sony/ATV Songs LLC. Henry CALLIE served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (McDermott, Ken)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Unichappell Music Inc., EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC., Broadcast Music, Inc., Springtime Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., MARY BONO, PWMP ACQUISITION I LLC, Fourteenth Hour Music Inc., REGENT MUSIC CORPORATION,, HOLLENBECK MUSIC, THREE WISE BOYS MUSIC, LLC, HOT-CHA MUSIC CO., Sony/ATV Songs LLC. LAKESIDE RESTAURANT, LLC served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (McDermott, Ken)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 6/11/19. (bs)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Broadcast Music, Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC., Fourteenth Hour Music Inc., HOLLENBECK MUSIC, HOT-CHA MUSIC CO., MARY BONO, PWMP ACQUISITION I LLC, REGENT MUSIC CORPORATION,, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Springtime Music, Inc., THREE WISE BOYS MUSIC, LLC, Unichappell Music Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Songs of Universal, Inc.; Corporate Parent Primary Wave Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Management, LLC, Corporate Parent Plainfield Specialty Holdings, Inc. for PWMP ACQUISITION I LLC; Corporate Parent Warner Music Group Corp. for Cotillion Music, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc.; Corporate Parent EMI Group Global Ltd. for EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC.; Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. for Sony/ATV Songs LLC. (McDermott, Ken)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 AO121 Copyright Letter dated 6/7/19 from USDC Clerk's Office to Register of Copyrights; (ep)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Henry CALLIE, LAKESIDE RESTAURANT, LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ep)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Henry CALLIE, LAKESIDE RESTAURANT, LLC ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4780471), filed by Songs of Universal, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., MARY BONO, EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC., PWMP ACQUISITION I LLC, Fourteenth Hour Music Inc., REGENT MUSIC CORPORATION,, HOLLENBECK MUSIC, THREE WISE BOYS MUSIC, LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., Springtime Music, Inc., HOT-CHA MUSIC CO., Sony/ATV Songs LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. LAKESIDE RESTAURANT, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Ken J. McDermott, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PWMP ACQUISITION I LLC
Represented By: Ken J. McDermott, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Springtime Music, Inc.
Represented By: Ken J. McDermott, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC.
Represented By: Ken J. McDermott, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Ken J. McDermott, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOT-CHA MUSIC CO.
Represented By: Ken J. McDermott, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOLLENBECK MUSIC
Represented By: Ken J. McDermott, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc.
Represented By: Ken J. McDermott, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY BONO
Represented By: Ken J. McDermott, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THREE WISE BOYS MUSIC, LLC
Represented By: Ken J. McDermott, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REGENT MUSIC CORPORATION,
Represented By: Ken J. McDermott, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fourteenth Hour Music Inc.
Represented By: Ken J. McDermott, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unichappell Music Inc.
Represented By: Ken J. McDermott, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cotillion Music, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAKESIDE RESTAURANT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry CALLIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?