Mack v. Romulus Inc.
Plaintiff: Leanna Randall and Devin Mack
Defendant: Romulus, Inc., RMLS-HOP Restaurants PA, L.P. and RMLS HOP Restaurants PA, LLP
Case Number: 3:2019cv00992
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: A Richard Caputo
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Romulus, Inc. (Miller, Michael)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel Attaching Proposed Order Denying Defendant Romulus Inc.'s Pending Motion to Dismiss as Moot . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Winebrake, Peter)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued (Amended Complaint filed) as to Romulus, Inc., RMLS HOP Restaurants PA, LLP, Party RMLS-HOP Restaurants PA, L.P. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ep) Modified on 7/26/2019 (ep).
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Romulus, Inc., RMLS HOP Restaurants PA, LLP, Party RMLS-HOP Restaurants PA, L.P. filed by Devin Mack, Leanna Randall.(Santillo, R.) Modified on 7/26/2019 (ep).
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to David A. Selden, Esq.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 7/18/19. (dw)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Romulus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #3 Memo, #4 Exhibit(s) A)(Miller, Michael)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Michael R. Miller on behalf of Romulus, Inc. Attorney David A. Selden is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4810914.. (Miller, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Devin Mack, Leanna Randall. Romulus, Inc. served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Gottesfeld, Mark)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Miller on behalf of Romulus, Inc. (Miller, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Leanna Randall of Her Own Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Winebrake, Peter)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Devin Mack of Her Own Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Winebrake, Peter)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Romulus, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ep)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Romulus, Inc. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4781986), filed by Devin Mack, Leanna Randall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mack v. Romulus Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leanna Randall
Represented By: Mark J. Gottesfeld
Represented By: R. Andrew Santillo
Represented By: Peter Winebrake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin Mack
Represented By: Mark J. Gottesfeld
Represented By: R. Andrew Santillo
Represented By: Peter Winebrake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romulus, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMLS-HOP Restaurants PA, L.P.
Represented By: Mark J. Gottesfeld
Represented By: R. Andrew Santillo
Represented By: Peter Winebrake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMLS HOP Restaurants PA, LLP
Represented By: Mark J. Gottesfeld
Represented By: R. Andrew Santillo
Represented By: Peter Winebrake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?