Hunsinger v. The Proctor & Gamble Company
Plaintiff: Melissa Hunsinger
Defendant: The Proctor & Gamble Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01011
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from Stephani O. Zorn Requesting a Continuance. (Friedman, Michael)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference VIA TELEPHONE set for 9/24/2019 10:30 AM. The placement of the telephone conference call is the responsibility of the plaintiff. The completed Joint Case Management Plan must be filed at least 5 days prior to the Case Management Conference. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 8/2/19. (jam)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Proctor & Gamble Company. (Zorn, Stephanie)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Proctor & Gamble Company.(Zorn, Stephanie)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Stephanie O. Zorn, Esq.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 7/22/19. (jam)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Michael S. Friedman on behalf of The Proctor & Gamble Company Attorney Stephanie Zorn is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4820360., filed by on behalf of The Proctor & Gamble Company.(Friedman, Michael)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Friedman on behalf of The Proctor & Gamble Company (Friedman, Michael)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT On Service by Melissa Hunsinger. (Parker, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint served on shelbi Sullenberger, SOP Intake Associate on 7/11/19, filed by Melissa Hunsinger. (Parker, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. You are directed to file a written report within 30 days as to whether service has been effected or a waiver of service obtained. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 6/17/19. (jam)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The Proctor & Gamble Company and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ga)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Proctor & Gamble Company ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4787512), filed by Melissa Hunsinger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunsinger v. The Proctor & Gamble Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Hunsinger
Represented By: Michael J. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Proctor & Gamble Company
Represented By: Stephanie O Zorn
Represented By: Michael S. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?