Sunnygem, LLC v. Terrafina, LLC
Plaintiff: Sunnygem, LLC
Defendant: Terrafina, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01032
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: James M Munley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Terrafina, LLCSigned by Honorable James M. Munley on 8/7/19. (sm)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Pretrial Order by Sunnygem, LLC. (Shaffer, Bret)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Sunnygem, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Shaffer, Bret)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sunnygem, LLC. Terrafina, LLC served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Shaffer, Bret)
June 20, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case assigned to Judge Munley. (aaa)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Sunnygem, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sandridge Partners, LP for Sunnygem, LLC. (Shaffer, Bret)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Terrafina, LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (bg)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Terrafina, LLC ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4790529), filed by Sunnygem, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B)(bg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sunnygem, LLC v. Terrafina, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunnygem, LLC
Represented By: Steven J. Schiffman
Represented By: Bret P. Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrafina, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?