Nelson v. Lowe et al
Petitioner: Michael Nelson
Respondent: Kevin Mcalleenan, Simona Flores, DHS U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Craig A. Lowe and Mark A Morgan
Case Number: 3:2019cv01037
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Referring Judge: Joseph F Saporito
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainees
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case administratively closed pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. No. 12) filed on 7/29/2019. (ve)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michael Nelson (Frankel, Richard)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 EXHIBIT 14 (Audio CD) re #10 by DHS U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Simona Flores, Craig A. Lowe, Kevin Mcalleenan, Mark A Morgan. CD placed in Harrisburg Media File. (aaa)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by DHS U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Simona Flores, Craig A. Lowe, Kevin Mcalleenan, Mark A Morgan by DHS U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Simona Flores, Craig A. Lowe, Kevin Mcalleenan, Mark A Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Sanderson, Joanne)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Richard H. FrankelSigned by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 6/27/19. (ms)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order VERBAL ORDER by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner - Case Reassigned to Honorable Yvette Kane and referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr as one or more parties have not consented to the jurisdiction of a U.S. Magistrate Judge. (jw)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 SHOW CAUSE ORDER and Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Served on Warden Craig Lowe, U.S. Atty Scranton and U.S. Atty General Wash DC (ep)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to DHS U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Simona Flores, Craig A. Lowe, Kevin Mcalleenan, Mark A Morgan YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 7/26/2019 (ms)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Michael Nelson (ATTY HUFE)YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 7/26/2019 (ms)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Michael Nelson (ATTY FRANKEL)YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 7/26/2019 (ms)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; granting in part and denying in part #2 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Clerk shall serve a copy of the petition and this order on the proper respondent, Craig A. Lowe, Warden of Pike County Correctional Facility, and on the U.S. Attorney. See Order for complete details. Show Cause Response due by 7/19/2019.Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 6/26/19. (ms)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Richard H Frankel on behalf of Michael Nelson Attorney Richard Frankel is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4793325.. (Frankel, Richard)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Michael Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Frankel, Richard)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $5, Receipt Number 4792145), filed by Michael Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Exhibit(s) 3, #5 Exhibit(s) 4, #6 Exhibit(s) 5, #7 Exhibit(s) 6, #8 Exhibit(s) 7, #9 Exhibit(s) 8, #10 Exhibit(s) 9, #11 Exhibit(s) 10, #12 Exhibit(s) 11, #13 Exhibit(s) 12, #14 Exhibit(s) 13, #15 Exhibit(s) 14, #16 Exhibit(s) 15)(ga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Lowe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin Mcalleenan
Represented By: Joseph Terz
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Simona Flores
Represented By: Joseph Terz
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DHS U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Joseph Terz
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Craig A. Lowe
Represented By: Joseph Terz
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark A Morgan
Represented By: Joseph Terz
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Nelson
Represented By: Richard H Frankel
Represented By: Katelyn Mary Hufe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?