MODE Transportation, LLC v. Golden Technologies, Inc.

Plaintiff: MODE Transportation, LLC
Counter Plaintiff: Golden Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01045
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: James M Munley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Golden Technologies, Inc.. (Borland, Kimberly)
August 1, 2019 Filing 15 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Golden Technologies by MODE Transportation, LLC.(Lamanna, Brendan)
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by David M Poell on behalf of MODE Transportation, LLC (Poell, David)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2019 10:30 AM in Scranton before Honorable James M. Munley.Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 7/30/19. (sm)
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 STANDING ORDER #1Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 7/30/19. (sm)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan G Lamanna on behalf of MODE Transportation, LLC. (Lamanna, Brendan)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Answer, Additional Defenses and Counterclaim, COUNTERCLAIM against Golden Technologies, Inc. by Golden Technologies, Inc..(Borland, Kimberly)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Brendan Lamanna, Paul Werner, and David PoellSigned by Honorable James M. Munley on 7/11/19. (sm)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Gregory M Mallon, Jr on behalf of MODE Transportation, LLC Attorney David Poell is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4811265.. (Mallon, Gregory)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Gregory M Mallon, Jr on behalf of MODE Transportation, LLC Attorney Paul Werner is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4811236.. (Mallon, Gregory)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Gregory M Mallon, Jr on behalf of MODE Transportation, LLC Attorney Brendan G. Lamanna is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4811142.. (Mallon, Gregory)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Golden Technologies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Golden Brothers, Inc. for Golden Technologies, Inc.. (Borland, Kimberly)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint filed by MODE Transportation, LLC of Affiant Brian Duffy. (Mallon, Gregory)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly D. Borland on behalf of Golden Technologies, Inc.. (Borland, Kimberly)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Golden Technologies, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (cw)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Golden Technologies, Inc. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4792752), filed by MODE Transportation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A)(cw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MODE Transportation, LLC v. Golden Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Golden Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly D. Borland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MODE Transportation, LLC
Represented By: Gregory M Mallon, Jr.
Represented By: David M. Poell
Represented By: Paul A. Werner
Represented By: Paul A Werner
Represented By: David M Poell
Represented By: Brendan G Lamanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?