Kufrovich v. DeHart

Appellee: Charles J. DeHart, III
Appellant: Gerald Kufrovich
Trustee: United States Trustee
Intervenor: Goshen Mortgage LLC as Separate Trustee for GBDT I Trust 2011-1
Case Number: 3:2019cv01057
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Notice of Appeal in the above-referenced matter was filed on June 21, 2019 and transmitted to District Court on July 31, 2019. To date, the times set forth in Fed. R. Bank. P. 8009 and 8010 have passed and no further filings have been received in connection with the appeal. Accordingly, the record is being transmitted based on the submissions filed as of today's date. (BK Court W-B 1, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 Correspondence Re: Rule 8009 by Gerald Kufrovich. #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, (BK Court W-B 1, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Goshen Mortgage LLC as Separate Trustee for GBDT I Trust 2011-1 re #5 MOTION to Intervene with Certificate of Non-Concurrence . (Kelly, Steven)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Intervene with Certificate of Non-Concurrence by Goshen Mortgage LLC as Separate Trustee for GBDT I Trust 2011-1. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Kelly, Steven)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Appellant shall have until August 23, 2019 to file his brief. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 7/24/19 (bs)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief filed by Gerald Kufrovich.(ga)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Re: Bankruptcy Appeal. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 6/24/19. (bs)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 5:18-bk-03317. Bankruptcy Judge Presiding Over Bankruptcy Case Robert N. Opel. File received (Attachments: #1 Order Denying Motion to Reinstate Case 18-03317)(BK Court W-B 1, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kufrovich v. DeHart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Charles J. DeHart, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Gerald Kufrovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: United States Trustee
Represented By: Anne K. Fiorenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Goshen Mortgage LLC as Separate Trustee for GBDT I Trust 2011-1
Represented By: Steven P. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?