Schuylkill Oncology Management, LLC v. Oncology Services International, Inc.

Plaintiff: Schuylkill Oncology Management, LLC
Defendant: Oncology Services International, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01131
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference VIA TELEPHONE set for 10/30/2019 11:15 AM. The placement of the telephone conference call is the responsibility of the plaintiff. The completed Joint Case Management Plan must be filed at least 5 days prior to the Case Management Conference. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 8/21/19. (jam)
August 16, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Oncology Services International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Sur-Reply)(Hanson, Morgan)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Robyn A. Shelton withdrawn as counsel for Oncology Services International, Inc. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 8/14/19 (jam)
August 13, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY BRIEF re #19 MOTION to Remand filed by Schuylkill Oncology Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s))(Kennedy, Andrew)
August 9, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Oncology Services International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shelton, Robyn)
August 6, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY BRIEF re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Or in the Alternative MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Oncology Services International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Hanson, Morgan)
August 6, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY BRIEF re #5 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Oncology Services International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Hanson, Morgan)
August 2, 2019 Filing 23 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #19 MOTION to Remand filed by Oncology Services International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A (Declaration of Kristen Fage), #2 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Shelton, Robyn)
July 23, 2019 Filing 22 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Or in the Alternative MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Schuylkill Oncology Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s))(Kennedy, Andrew)
July 23, 2019 Filing 21 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #5 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Schuylkill Oncology Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Andrew)
July 19, 2019 Filing 20 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #19 MOTION to Remand filed by Schuylkill Oncology Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s))(Kennedy, Andrew)
July 19, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand by Schuylkill Oncology Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Andrew)
July 19, 2019 Filing 18 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Andrew J. Kennedy, Esq.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 7/19/19. (jam)
July 18, 2019 Filing 17 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Andrew J. Kennedy on behalf of Schuylkill Oncology Management, LLC Attorney Andrew Kennedy is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4818612., filed by on behalf of Schuylkill Oncology Management, LLC.(Kennedy, Andrew)
July 15, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan J. Hanson on behalf of Oncology Services International, Inc.. (Hanson, Morgan)
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Katie R. Jacobs on behalf of Oncology Services International, Inc.. (Jacobs, Katie)
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 7/12/19. (jam)
July 11, 2019 Filing 13 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Megan M. Carroll, Esq.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 7/11/19. (jam)
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Brian P. Baggott, Esq.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 7/11/19. (jam)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER finding as moot #4 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 7/11/19 (jam)
July 10, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Judge Robert Mariani has been assigned to this case. (ga)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Megan M Carroll on behalf of Oncology Services International, Inc. Attorney Megan Carroll is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4810026.. (Carroll, Megan)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Brian P Baggott on behalf of Oncology Services International, Inc. Attorney Brian Baggott is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4810022., filed by on behalf of Oncology Services International, Inc..(Baggott, Brian)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Or in the Alternative MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Oncology Services International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A (Service Contract Agreement), #2 Ex. B (Unpublished Opinions))(Shelton, Robyn)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Or in the Alternative, MOTION to Transfer Case by Oncology Services International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shelton, Robyn)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Oncology Services International, Inc..(Shelton, Robyn)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss and, MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Oncology Services International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Shelton, Robyn)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation by Oncology Services International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shelton, Robyn)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oncology Services International, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Jordan Health Products III, Inc. for Oncology Services International, Inc... (Shelton, Robyn)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBITS by Oncology Services International, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) B)(ao)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Oncology Services International, Inc. from Court of Common Pleas of Schuylkill County, case number S-834-19. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 03144804722), filed by Oncology Services International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schuylkill Oncology Management, LLC v. Oncology Services International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oncology Services International, Inc.
Represented By: Robyn A. Shelton
Represented By: Brian P. Baggott
Represented By: Megan M. Carroll
Represented By: Megan M Carroll
Represented By: Morgan J. Hanson
Represented By: Brian P Baggott
Represented By: Katie R. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schuylkill Oncology Management, LLC
Represented By: Marcy L. Colkitt
Represented By: Andrew J. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?