Optimize Courier, LLC v. Ally et al

Plaintiff: Optimize Courier, LLC
Defendant: Nichole Ally and Easyflyers USA Logistics Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv01156
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: A Richard Caputo
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 19 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Jumara Factors Brief filed by Optimize Courier, LLC.(Ford, Tom)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Plaintiff shall file a brief within fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this Order addressing why the public and private interest factors do not warrant transfer of this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Defendants may file a response within seven (7) days of the filing of Plaintiff's brief.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 8/22/19. (ga)
August 15, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY BRIEF re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Nichole Ally, Easyflyers USA Logistics Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Certificate of Service)(Villanueva, Mark)
August 1, 2019 Filing 16 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Optimize Courier, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Response to Motions to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Artie Kingren)(Ford, Tom)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Amend/Correct. The hearing scheduled for July 23, 2019 is cancelled. Plaintiff's brief in opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss shall be filed on or before 8/1/19. Defendants' reply brief, if any, shall be filed on or before 8/15/19. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 7/22/19. (dw)
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct #8 Scheduling Order, and Notice of Withdrawal of Petition for Preliminary Injunction by Optimize Courier, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ford, Tom)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Nichole Ally, Easyflyers USA Logistics Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Concurrence, #3 Memo, #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Certificate of Service)(Villanueva, Mark)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 7/17/19. (dw)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation for Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Nichole Ally, Easyflyers USA Logistics Incorporated.(Villanueva, Mark)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Adam J. Petitt, Esq.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 7/12/19. (dw)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Mark D. Villanueva, Esq.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 7/12/19. (dw)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: 1. Defendants Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2), (6) shall be filed on or before July 18, 2019. 2. Plaintiffs Brief in Opposition shall be filed on or before July 22, 2019. 3. Hearing on Motion to Dismiss and Petition for Preliminary Injunction set for 7/23/2019 11:00 AM in Wilkes-Barre - Courtroom 3 before Honorable A. Richard Caputo.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 7/12/19. (dw)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Michael D. O'Mara on behalf of Nichole Ally, Easyflyers USA Logistics Incorporated Attorney Adam J. Petitt is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4811805.. (O'Mara, Michael)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Michael D. O'Mara on behalf of Nichole Ally, Easyflyers USA Logistics Incorporated Attorney Mark D. Villanueva is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4811796.. (O'Mara, Michael)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Tom Ford Counsel for Plaintiff requesting status conference. (Ford, Tom)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Optimize Courier, LLC. (Ford, Tom)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Optimize Courier, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex A Proof of Delivery, #2 Exhibit(s) Ex B Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit(s) Ex C Proof of Delivery, #4 Exhibit(s) Ex D Proof of Delivery, #5 Exhibit(s) Ex E Affidavit of Service)(Ford, Tom)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nichole Ally, Easyflyers USA Logistics Incorporated from Monroe County Court of Common Pleas, case number 46045CV2019. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-4807407), filed by Nichole Ally, Easyflyers USA Logistics Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Optimize Courier, LLC v. Ally et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nichole Ally
Represented By: Mark D. Villanueva
Represented By: Adam J. Petitt
Represented By: Michael D. O'Mara
Represented By: Mark D Villanueva
Represented By: Adam J Petitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Easyflyers USA Logistics Incorporated
Represented By: Mark D. Villanueva
Represented By: Adam J. Petitt
Represented By: Michael D. O'Mara
Represented By: Mark D Villanueva
Represented By: Adam J Petitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Optimize Courier, LLC
Represented By: Tom Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?