Matylewicz v. County of Lackawanna Transit System Authority (COLTS)
Plaintiff: Linda Matylewicz
Defendant: County of Lackawanna Transit System Authority (COLTS)
Case Number: 3:2019cv01169
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:626
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference VIA TELEPHONE set for 10/30/2019 11:00 AM. The placement of the telephone conference call is the responsibility of the plaintiff. The completed Joint Case Management Plan must be filed at least 5 days prior to the Case Management Conference. See Order for full details. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 8/21/19. (jam)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by County of Lackawanna Transit System Authority (COLTS).(Nagy, Jill)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by County of Lackawanna Transit System Authority (COLTS). County of Lackawanna Transit System Authority (COLTS) waiver sent on 8/8/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Summers, Sean)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued (Amended Complaint filed) as to County of Lackawanna Transit System Authority (COLTS) and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ep)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Linda Matylewicz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Hanchulak, Gerald)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by County of Lackawanna Transit System Authority (COLTS). County of Lackawanna Transit System Authority (COLTS) waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Summers, Sean)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill Elaine Nagy on behalf of County of Lackawanna Transit System Authority (COLTS) (Nagy, Jill)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean E. Summers on behalf of County of Lackawanna Transit System Authority (COLTS) (Summers, Sean)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. You are directed to file a written report within 30 days as to whether service has been effected or a waiver of service obtained. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 7/12/19. (jam)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to County of Lackawanna Transit System Authority (COLTS) and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ep)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against County of Lackawanna Transit System Authority (COLTS) ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4809542), filed by Linda Matylewicz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matylewicz v. County of Lackawanna Transit System Authority (COLTS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Matylewicz
Represented By: Gerald John Hanchulak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Lackawanna Transit System Authority (COLTS)
Represented By: Sean E. Summers
Represented By: Jill Elaine Nagy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?