Ranieli v. State Farm Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Joseph J Ranieli
Defendant: State Farm Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01176
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: James M Munley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Joseph J Ranieli.(Mey, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE by Joseph J Ranieli to #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Mey, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by State Farm Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Pasqualino Opinion)(Drakas, Gary)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by State Farm Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Nonconcurrence)(Drakas, Gary)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by State Farm Insurance Company. (ga)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Joseph J Ranieli ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4810912), filed by State Farm Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ga) Modified on 7/10/2019 (ga).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ranieli v. State Farm Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph J Ranieli
Represented By: Michael R. Mey
Represented By: John D. Nardone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary A. Drakas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?