Pratts v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff: Jennifer Pratts
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01192
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: A Richard Caputo
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, in Statutory Interpleader by State Farm Fire and Casualty Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(DeSipio, Yolanda)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Jennifer Pratts. State Farm Fire and Casualty Bank of America, N.A. waiver sent on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Mulcahey, John)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State Farm Fire and Casualty Bank of America, N.A. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4808914), filed by Jennifer Pratts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(ga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pratts v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Pratts
Represented By: John M. Mulcahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Yolanda K. DeSipio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?