Moyer v. Allen, et al
Plaintiff: Mark Moyer
Defendant: Teresa Bassett Moyer Allen, The Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust and Trustees of the Boilermaker Blacksmith National Pension Trust
Case Number: 3:2019cv01270
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by pltf. on 10/15/19 by deft. on 11/15/2019. Fact Discovery due by 12/18/2019. Joinder of Parties due by pltf. on 10/15/19 by deft. on 11/15/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/31/2020.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 9/19/19. (bs)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Party Under Rule 21 filed by Trustees of the Boilermaker Blacksmith National Pension Trust.(Kakazu, Nathan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Party Under Rule 21 by Trustees of the Boilermaker Blacksmith National Pension Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kakazu, Nathan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service of Joint Case Management Plan by Trustees of the Boilermaker Blacksmith National Pension Trust . (Kakazu, Nathan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Trustees of the Boilermaker Blacksmith National Pension Trust. (Kakazu, Nathan)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2019 10:30 AM before Honorable Malachy E Mannion.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 8/13/19. (bs)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Trustees of the Boilermaker Blacksmith National Pension Trust.(Kakazu, Nathan)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 7/29/19. (bs)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Nathan Kakazu.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 7/23/19. (bs)
July 23, 2019 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM AND ECF REGISTRATION FORM mailed to Attorney Jack Bernard. (lg)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Jillian N Snider on behalf of The Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust Attorney Nathan Kakazu is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4822394.. (Snider, Jillian)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBITS by The Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust re #1 Notice of Removal,. (ao)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust from Court of Common Pleas of Pike County, case number 250-2019. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-4821676), filed by The Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moyer v. Allen, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Bassett Moyer Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust
Represented By: Jillian N Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustees of the Boilermaker Blacksmith National Pension Trust
Represented By: Jillian N Snider
Represented By: Nathan Kakazu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Moyer
Represented By: Jack M. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?