Garanin et al v. City of Scranton et al
Plaintiff: Rock Property Holdings LLC, Ferndrive LLC, Vsevolod Garanin, Garanin Properties LLC and Auric Investment Holdings LLC
Defendant: Patrick L. Hinton, Lori Uher, Tamilyn Carmona, City of Scranton and William L. Courtright
Case Number: 3:2019cv01275
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Martin C Carlson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Consolidation of Actions filed by Tamilyn Carmona, City of Scranton, William L. Courtright, Patrick L. Hinton, Lori Uher.(O'Brien, Michael)
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Auric Investment Holdings LLC, Tamilyn Carmona, City of Scranton, William L. Courtright, Ferndrive LLC, Vsevolod Garanin, Garanin Properties LLC, Patrick L. Hinton, Rock Property Holdings LLC, Lori Uher YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 10/7/2019 (kjn)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Consolidation of Actions. Brief in Opposition due by 9/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on August 28, 2019. (kjn)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Consolidation of Actions filed by Tamilyn Carmona, City of Scranton, William L. Courtright, Patrick L. Hinton, Lori Uher. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Concurrence Certificate of Concurrence, #2 Proposed Order Proposed order)(Kraycer, Jenna)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Exceed Word Count. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on August 21, 2019. (kjn)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation and Word Count by Tamilyn Carmona, City of Scranton, William L. Courtright, Patrick L. Hinton, Lori Uher. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Concurrence Certificate of Concurrence, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kraycer, Jenna)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna M. Kraycer on behalf of All Defendants. (Kraycer, Jenna)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Consolidation of Actions by Tamilyn Carmona, City of Scranton, William L. Courtright, Patrick L. Hinton, Lori Uher.(O'Brien, Michael)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vsevolod Garanin. City of Scranton served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019; William L. Courtright served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019; Patrick L. Hinton served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019; Lori Uher served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (ep)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Vsevolod Garanin (ep)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE : You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa) Modified on 7/26/2019 (aaa).
July 24, 2019 Receipt of payment from VSEVOLOD GARANIN in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE. Transaction posted on 7/23/2019. Receipt number 111024116 processed by aarlidge. (jjs, )
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER informing the parties of their briefing and other responsibilities.Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on 07/24/19. (Attachments: #1 285 Service Packet with IFP Notice)(pjr)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED. (pjr)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 111024116) filed by Ferndrive LLC, Garanin Properties LLC, Auric Investment Holdings LLC, Vsevolod Garanin, Rock Property Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Receipt)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garanin et al v. City of Scranton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick L. Hinton
Represented By: Michael J. O'Brien
Represented By: Jenna M. Kraycer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Uher
Represented By: Michael J. O'Brien
Represented By: Jenna M. Kraycer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamilyn Carmona
Represented By: Michael J. O'Brien
Represented By: Jenna M. Kraycer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Scranton
Represented By: Michael J. O'Brien
Represented By: Jenna M. Kraycer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William L. Courtright
Represented By: Michael J. O'Brien
Represented By: Jenna M. Kraycer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rock Property Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferndrive LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vsevolod Garanin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garanin Properties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auric Investment Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?