Diehl et al v. SWN Production Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Melanie L. Diehl, Robert W. Diehl and Robert W. Diehl, Jr.
Defendant: SWN Production Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01303
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY BRIEF re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by SWN Production Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Mercer, Jeremy)
October 7, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: At the request of counsel Doc. 12 deleted. (pjr)
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Corrective Brief to correct font size of footnotes filed by Robert W. Diehl, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance with Word Count, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Appendix Unreported Case)(Burnett, Robert)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by SWN Production Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s), #2 Certificate of Compliance With Local Rule 7.8(b), #3 Certificate of Service)(Mercer, Jeremy)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference VIA TELEPHONE set for 12/2/2019 10:30 AM. The placement of the telephone conference call is the responsibility of the plaintiff. The completed Joint Case Management Plan must be filed at least 5 days prior to the Case Management Conference. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 9/11/19. (jam)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by SWN Production Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Mercer, Jeremy)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against SWN Production Company, LLC, filed by Robert W. Diehl, Melanie L. Diehl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H)(Burnett, Robert)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by SWN Production Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Mercer, Jeremy)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Writ of Summons served on SWN Production Company, LLC's Registered Agent, CT Corporation Company on January 4, 2019, filed by Melanie L. Diehl, Robert W. Diehl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Burnett, Robert)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by SWN Production Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Mercer, Jeremy)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 7/29/19. (jam)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by SWN Production Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Southwestern Energy Company for SWN Production Company, LLC. (ao)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBITS 1-4 by SWN Production Company, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 2, #2 Exhibit(s) 3, #3 Exhibit(s) 4)(ao)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SWN Production Company, LLC from Court of Common Pleas of Susquehanna County, case number 1643 of 2018. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-4827038), filed by SWN Production Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cert of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diehl et al v. SWN Production Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWN Production Company, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy A. Mercer
Represented By: Kevin C. Meacham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie L. Diehl
Represented By: Robert J. Burnett
Represented By: Brendan A. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W. Diehl
Represented By: Robert J. Burnett
Represented By: Brendan A. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W. Diehl, Jr.
Represented By: Robert J. Burnett
Represented By: Brendan A. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?