Picone et al v. Nationwide General Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Maria Picone and Cesare Picone
Defendant: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01457
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: James M Munley
Referring Judge: Joseph F Saporito
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Huffman, Lily) Modified on 10/18/2019 (ms).
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 10/16/19 RESCHEDULED TO 10/22/2019 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito Jr.Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 10/16/19. (ms)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito Jr. Conference to be initiated by the Court. Attached scheduling order to be completed and provided to Court 3 business days prior to conference.Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 10/2/19. (ms)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge Saporito Approved. Case Managment Conference previously scheduled before JMM is cancelled.Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 10/1/19. (sm)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Nationwide General Insurance Company Consent to a Magistrate Judge (Huffman, Lily)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Huffman, Lily)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/2/2019 10:00 AM in Scranton before Honorable James M. Munley.Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 9/6/19. (sm)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER #1Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 9/6/19. (sm)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Nationwide General Insurance Company.(Huffman, Lily)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lily Koohday Huffman on behalf of Nationwide General Insurance Company (Huffman, Lily)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (kpf)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationwide General Insurance Company from Court of Common Pleas of Schuylkill County, case number S-853-19. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 4851008), filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s))(kpf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Picone et al v. Nationwide General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Picone
Represented By: Michael J. Fiorillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesare Picone
Represented By: Michael J. Fiorillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Represented By: Lily Koohday Huffman
Represented By: Pamela A. Carlos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?