Earnshaw et al v. Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC
Plaintiff: William N. Earnshaw and Helen A Earnshaw
Defendant: Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC
Amicus Curiae: Equinor USA Onshore Properties, INC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01479
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: A Richard Caputo
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 10/22/19. (dw)
October 16, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion To Remand by Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dempsey, John)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Brief in Opposition due by 10/25/2019.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 10/15/19. (dw)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Counts I and II of Complaint filed by Helen A Earnshaw, William N. Earnshaw. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blake, Geff)
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court Pursuant to U.S.C. 1447 (c) filed by Helen A Earnshaw, William N. Earnshaw.(Blake, Geff)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT by Chesapeake Appalachia, L.L.C. and Equinor USA Onshore Properties, Inc. f/k/a Statoil USA Onshore Properties, Inc. re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Unpublished Opinions)(Dempsey, John)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court Pursuant to U.S.C. 1447 (c) by Helen A Earnshaw, William N. Earnshaw.(Blake, Geff)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Geff Blake on behalf of Helen A Earnshaw, William N. Earnshaw (Blake, Geff)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Lease Modification, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Declarations & Notices of Pooled Units, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Oil & Gas Production Report, #4 Proposed Order)(Dempsey, John)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Stefanie Lepore Burt on behalf of Equinor USA Onshore Properties, INC. (Burt, Stefanie)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 9/10/19. (dw)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead. Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC answer due 9/17/2019. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 8/30/19. (dw)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dempsey, John)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Equinor USA Onshore Properties, INC., Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC from Court of Common Pleas of Wyoming County, case number 019-cv-850. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 4853724), filed by Equinor USA Onshore Properties, INC., Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Appendix)(ga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Earnshaw et al v. Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William N. Earnshaw
Represented By: Richard L Huffsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen A Earnshaw
Represented By: Richard L Huffsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas F. Kravitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Equinor USA Onshore Properties, INC.
Represented By: Nicholas F. Kravitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?