Reider et al v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Carolyn Reider and David Reider
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insuance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, The First Liberty Insurance Company and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01505
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher W Woodward on behalf of LM General Insurance Company. (Woodward, Christopher)
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LM General Insurance Company. (Alford, Brigid)
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant's ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by LM General Insurance Company.(Alford, Brigid)
September 19, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: (Doc. 3) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Motion to Strike Immaterial/Impertinent Matter is DEEMED WITHDRAWN in light of Amended Complaint (Doc. 9) filed 9/18/19. (jam)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to LM General Insurance Company and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ep)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE REPORT. (Smacchi, David)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Carolyn Reider, David Reider.(Smacchi, David)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint reflecting the areed upon amendments (See Doc. 6, 5(a)) on or before 9/24/19. Upon the filing of an amended complaint, the Court will DEEM WITHDRAWN Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Motion to Strike (Doc. 3). Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 9/17/19. (jam)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order approving re #6 Joint Stipulation to correct name of Defendant and to agree to amendment of complaint to resolve issues raised in Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 9/17/19. (jam)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION Joint to Correct Name of Defendant and to Agree to Amendment of Complaint to Resolve Issues Raised in Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Liberty Mutual Fire Insuance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, The First Liberty Insurance Company. (Alford, Brigid)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Liberty Mutual Fire Insuance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, The First Liberty Insurance Company. (Alford, Brigid)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Motion to Strike Immaterial/Impertinent Matter filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insuance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, The First Liberty Insurance Company.(Alford, Brigid)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Motion to Strike Immaterial/Impertinent Matter by Liberty Mutual Fire Insuance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, The First Liberty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Proposed Order)(Alford, Brigid)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 9/3/19. (jam)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The First Liberty Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insuance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company from Court of Common Pleas of Luzerne County, case number 2019-cv-9642. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 4858664), filed by The First Liberty Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insuance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Table of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit(s))(ga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reider et al v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insuance Company
Represented By: Brigid Q. Alford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group
Represented By: Brigid Q. Alford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The First Liberty Insurance Company
Represented By: Brigid Q. Alford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Brigid Q. Alford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Reider
Represented By: Christopher W Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Reider
Represented By: Christopher W Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?