Benco Dental Supply, Co. v. Tams
Plaintiff: Benco Dental Supply, Co.
Defendant: Mark Tams
Case Number: 3:2019cv01528
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 24 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #18 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue filed by Mark Tams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits and Unpublished Decisions, #2 Exhibit(s) Word Count Cert.)(Dice, Denis)
October 30, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY BRIEF re #7 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Benco Dental Supply, Co..(Oberlander, Scott)
October 30, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY BRIEF re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Benco Dental Supply, Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits to Reply Brief)(Oberlander, Scott)
October 24, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert D. Finkel (Finkel, Robert)
October 18, 2019 Filing 20 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mark Tams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Cert. of Word Count, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibits to Brief, #3 Proposed Order)(Dice, Denis)
October 18, 2019 Filing 19 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #7 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Mark Tams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order)(Dice, Denis)
October 18, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue by Mark Tams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Proposed Order)(Dice, Denis)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Extend Time to File Responses to Complaint and pending Motions. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 10/18/19. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction on or before 10/18/19. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery on or before 10/18/19. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 10/11/19 (jam)
October 11, 2019 Filing 16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to to file Responses to the Complaint and Pending Motions by Mark Tams. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Concurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Dice, Denis)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses to the Complaint and Pending Motions. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery on or before 10/11/19. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 9/30/19 (jam)
September 27, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responses to the Complaint and Pending Motion by Mark Tams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Concurrence)(Dice, Denis)
September 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Denis C. Dice on behalf of Mark Tams (Dice, Denis)
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Robert D. Finkel, Esq.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 9/24/19. (jam)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Robert D. Finkel on behalf of Benco Dental Supply, Co. Attorney Robert Finkel is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4880507.. (Finkel, Robert)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benco Dental Supply, Co.. Mark Tams served on 9/15/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Oberlander, Scott)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 9/5/19. (jam)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF in Support re #7 MOTION to Expedite Discovery , filed by Benco Dental Supply, Co.. Related document: #7 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Benco Dental Supply, Co..(Oberlander, Scott)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Benco Dental Supply, Co.. (Attachments: #1 Table of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #5 Proposed Order)(Oberlander, Scott)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Benco Dental Supply, Co.. Related document: #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Benco Dental Supply, Co..(Oberlander, Scott)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Benco Dental Supply, Co.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Oberlander, Scott)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Mark Tams and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ao)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Benco Dental Supply, Co.. (ao)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBITS by Benco Dental Supply, Co. re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E)(ao)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark Tams ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4861734), filed by Benco Dental Supply, Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benco Dental Supply, Co. v. Tams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Tams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benco Dental Supply, Co.
Represented By: Scott C Oberlander
Represented By: Andrew J. Shapren
Represented By: Robert D. Finkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?