Bienias et al v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mark D. Bienias and Jill A. Bienias
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and Beneficial Consumer Discount Co.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01542
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Approving #8 Stipulation filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. that the deft. SPS may answer or otherwise respond to complaint on or before 11/15/19.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/17/19. (bs)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend Time by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc..(Hincy, April)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Approving #6 Stipulation filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. SPS may ans complaint on or before 10/15/19.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/1/19. (bs)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Extend Time by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Hincy, April)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Approving #3 Stipulation filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. that the defts. may respond to complaint on or before 10/1/19.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 9/12/19. (bs)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent SPS Holding Corp. for Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Hincy, April)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION to Extend Time by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc..(Hincy, April)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 9/11/19. (bs)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Beneficial Consumer Discount Co. from Luzerne County, case number 19-9938. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 4863807), filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Beneficial Consumer Discount Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bienias et al v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark D. Bienias
Represented By: Samuel M. Sanguedolce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill A. Bienias
Represented By: Samuel M. Sanguedolce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: April M. Hincy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beneficial Consumer Discount Co.
Represented By: April M. Hincy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?