Uronis v. Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Uronis
Defendant: Gassearch Drilling Services Corporation and Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv01557
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Presently before the court is plaintiffs amended complaint. (Doc. 13). Based upon this filing, the defendants motion to dismiss (Doc. 9) is DISMISSED without prejudice.terminating #9 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/6/19 (bs)
November 1, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued (Amended Complaint filed) as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (kpf)
October 31, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation, Gassearch Drilling Services Corporation, filed by Matthew Uronis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Corporation search results for Cabot, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Corporation search results fro GasSearch, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Excerpt of GDS Website, #4 Exhibit(s) D - Amended Complaint in the Messenger Action)(Murthy, Angeli)
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Christian Antkowiak.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/18/19. (bs)
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Christian C. Antkowiak on behalf of Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation, Gassearch Drilling Services Corporation Attorney Christian Antkowiak is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4902240.. (Antkowiak, Christian)
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation, Gassearch Drilling Services Corporation.(Barrette, Amy)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation, Gassearch Drilling Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barrette, Amy)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy L. Barrette on behalf of Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation, Gassearch Drilling Services Corporation (Barrette, Amy)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis M. Schaffner on behalf of Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation, Gassearch Drilling Services Corporation (Schaffner, Curtis)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Uronis. Gassearch Drilling Services Corporation served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (Murthy, Angeli)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Uronis. Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (Murthy, Angeli)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Matthew Uronis of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A- Consent to Join of Matthew Uroni)(Murthy, Angeli)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 9/11/19. (bs)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (kpf)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4866478), filed by Matthew Uronis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D)(kpf) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/10/2019) (kpf). (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/10/2019) (kpf). (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/10/2019) (kpf). (Attachment 3 replaced on 9/10/2019) (kpf). (Attachment 4 replaced on 9/10/2019) (kpf). (Attachment 5 replaced on 9/10/2019) (kpf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uronis v. Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Uronis
Represented By: Angeli Murthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gassearch Drilling Services Corporation
Represented By: Christian C. Antkowiak
Represented By: Amy L. Barrette
Represented By: Curtis M. Schaffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation
Represented By: Christian C. Antkowiak
Represented By: Amy L. Barrette
Represented By: Curtis M. Schaffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?