1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, successor in interest to Federal National Mortgage Association v. Antonello Boldrini
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association "Fannie Mae", Antonello Boldrini and 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its Individual Capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee
Case Number: 3:2019cv01576
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Martin C Carlson
Referring Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 109 RESPONSE by Antonello Boldrini to #70 Shavel Alleged Brief in Opposition to Boldrini's Motion (Doc. 67 & Doc. 68 & Doc. 69) dated 10/24/19. (ao)
November 8, 2019 Filing 108 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief in Support to his (Doc. 71) Motion to Correct the Text on (Doc. 52) filed by Antonello Boldrini.(ga) (Main Document 108 replaced on 11/8/2019) (ga).
November 8, 2019 Filing 107 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections and To Shavel's (Doc. 93 Amended Certificate of Service (70) by Antonello Boldrini.(ga)
November 8, 2019 Filing 106 Emergency MOTION Emergency Motion (A) Confirming the Lack of Stay of Proceedings From Defendants Appeals of Interlocutory Orders of this Court and (B) Relieving Plaintiff of the Requirement to File Responses to Defendants Pleading Absent an Order of the Court Directing a Response by 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its Individual Capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Moltion, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Shavel, Michael)
November 7, 2019 Filing 105 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief to #67 MOTION to Remove, #69 MOTION for Extension of Time to to File Objection to Order, #68 MOTION to File Request to File Objection to Orders re #29 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Set Motion and R&R Dealines/Hearings, #25 Order,,, Set Motion and R&R Dealines/Hearings,,, Terminate Motions,, filed by Antonello Boldrini.(ga)
November 6, 2019 Filing 104 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Antonello Boldrini to File Brief to #60 Boldrini's Motion for Preliminary Objection to Shavel's Motion to Substitute Plaintiff (Doc. 19 et seq.).(ep)
November 6, 2019 Filing 103 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief to #59 MOTION For Preliminary Objection To Motion to Remand (Doc. 12) filed by Antonello Boldrini.(ep)
November 5, 2019 Filing 102 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief to #53 Motion to Object and Vacate filed by Antonello Boldrini.(ep)
November 5, 2019 Filing 101 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief to #52 Motion in Opposition filed by Antonello Boldrini.(ep)
November 5, 2019 Filing 100 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #99 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objection to Doc. (72) Shavel's Motion for Sanction filed by 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its Individual Capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee.(Shavel, Michael)
November 4, 2019 Filing 99 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objection to Doc. (72) Shavel's Motion for Sanction by Antonello Boldrini.(ga) Modified on 11/5/2019 (ep).
November 4, 2019 Filing 98 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief to Shavel's Doc. 50, Brief in Opposition, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief filed by Antonello Boldrini.(ga)
November 4, 2019 Filing 97 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief to #43 Brief in Opposition, filed by Antonello Boldrini.(bg)
November 1, 2019 Filing 96 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections & Reconsiderations to Orders and Memorandums #47, 51,54,55,56,57,58,61, & 62 by Antonello Boldrini.(ga)
November 1, 2019 Filing 95 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief to Doc. 43 Shavel's Brief in Opposition by Antonello Boldrini.(ga)
November 1, 2019 Filing 94 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #91 MOTION to Strike #70 Brief in Opposition,, #85 Brief in Opposition,, filed by 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its Individual Capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee.(Shavel, Michael)
November 1, 2019 Filing 93 CERTIFICATE of of Service (Amended) by 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its Individual Capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee re #70 Brief in Opposition,, . (Shavel, Michael)
November 1, 2019 Filing 92 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #91 MOTION to Strike #70 Brief in Opposition,, #85 Brief in Opposition,, filed by Antonello Boldrini.(ga)
October 31, 2019 Filing 91 MOTION to Strike Michael Shavel Certificate of Services #70 , Page 4 of Brief in Opposition,, and Page 5 of #85 Brief in Opposition,, by Antonello Boldrini.(ga) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2019: #1 Exhibit(s) 1) (ga). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2019: #2 Exhibit(s) 2) (ga).
October 31, 2019 Filing 90 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief in Support to #46 Praecipe filed by Antonello Boldrini.(ga)
October 31, 2019 Filing 89 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief in Support to #45 Request filed by Antonello Boldrini.(ga)
October 31, 2019 Filing 88 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objection and Reconsideration Re( Order 44) by Antonello Boldrini.(ga) Modified on 11/1/2019 (ga).
October 31, 2019 Filing 87 Certification of Service (Amended), filed by 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its Individual Capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee.(Shavel, Michael)
October 31, 2019 Filing 85 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #76 MOTION to Amend/Correct #37 Certificate of Service, #83 MOTION for Extension of Time to File, #82 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief filed, #84 MOTION for Extension of Time to to file Brief in Support to His Doc. 40) Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief to Doc. 20 Brief in Opposition Re(Doc. 17) Motion to Strike Non Parties and it's (Doc. 12), #77 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Omnibus Opposition to Motions filed by Defendant on October 29 and 30, 2019 filed by 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its Individual Capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee.(Shavel, Michael)
October 30, 2019 Filing 84 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Brief in Support to His Doc. 40) Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief to Doc. 20 Brief in Opposition Re(Doc. 17) Motion to Strike Non Parties and it's (Doc. 12) by Antonello Boldrini. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(ga)
October 30, 2019 Filing 83 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief to "Shavel's Doc. 39 Brief in Opposition Re. (Doc. 38) by Antonello Boldrini. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(ga)
October 30, 2019 Filing 82 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief in Support to his (Doc. 41) Motion for Extension of time to File Brief in Opposition to (Doc. 19) Motion to Substitute Party filed by Antonello Boldrini. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(ga)
October 29, 2019 Filing 81 DUPLICATE DOCUMENT #65 by Antonello Boldrini. #65 MOTION for Extension of Time to to File Brief in Support to his Motion (Doc. 30) Objecting or Non Consent to Reassignment to Honorable Judge Robert Mariani. (ga)
October 29, 2019 Filing 80 DUPLICATE OF DOC. 64 by Antonello Boldrini. #64 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief filed. (ga)
October 29, 2019 Filing 79 SIGNATURE PAGE filed by Antonello Boldrini. #64 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief in Support to his Motion (Doc. 34). (ga)
October 29, 2019 Filing 78 SIGNATURE PAGE filed by Antonello Boldrini. #65 MOTION for Extension of Time to to File Brief in Support to his Motion (Doc. 30) Objecting or Non Consent to Reassignment to Honorable Judge Robert Mariani. (ga)
October 29, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief in Support to Doc. 38 "Motion for Relief from Order Pursuant to Rule 60(b) for Fraud in the Court filed by Antonello Boldrini. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Certificate of Service)(ga)
October 29, 2019 Filing 76 MOTION to Correct #37 Certificate of Service by Antonello Boldrini. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Certificate of Service)(ga)
October 29, 2019 Filing 75 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Antonello Boldrini re #71 MOTION to Amend/Correct #52 Brief in Opposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(ga)
October 29, 2019 Filing 74 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Antonello Boldrini re #52 Brief in Opposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(ga)
October 28, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE OF APPEAL in PRO SE NON-PRISONER Case as to #51 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, #44 Order,, Terminate Motions, #54 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #47 Order Staying Case by Antonello Boldrini. Filing Fee and Docket Fee NOT PAID. Filing fee $ 505 The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(ep)
October 28, 2019 Filing 72 MOTION for Sanctions by 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its Individual Capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Memo Memorandum of Law, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Shavel, Michael)
October 25, 2019 Filing 71 EMERGENCY MOTION to Correct the Text on #52 Brief in Opposition by Antonello Boldrini.(kpf)
October 25, 2019 Filing 70 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #67 MOTION to Remove, #69 MOTION for Extension of Time to to File Objection to Order, #68 MOTION to File Request to File Objection to Orders re #29 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Set Motion and R&R Dealines/Hearings, #25 Order,,, Set Motion and R&R Dealines/Hearings,,, Terminate Motions,, Omnibus Opposition to Motions filed by 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its Individual Capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee.(Shavel, Michael)
October 24, 2019 Filing 69 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objection to Order #35 by Antonello Boldrini.(kpf)
October 24, 2019 Filing 68 MOTION to File Request to File Objection to Orders re #29 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, #25 Order, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions by Antonello Boldrini.(kpf)
October 24, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION to Remove by Antonello Boldrini.(kpf)
October 24, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief in Support to his Motion (Doc. 30) Objecting or Non Consent to Reassignment to Honorable Judge Robert Mariani by Antonello Boldrini.(ga)
October 24, 2019 Filing 64 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief in Support to his Motion (Doc. 34) Motion for Disqualification of Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson filed by Antonello Boldrini.(ga)
October 24, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief to #36 Brief in Opposition filed by Antonello Boldrini.(ga)
October 24, 2019 Filing 62 AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #58 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - IT IS RECOMMENDED that the Plaintiffs motion to remand (Doc. #12 ) be GRANTED, and Boldirnis Motion for Preliminary Objection to Motion to Remand (Doc. #59 ), be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 11/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on October 24, 2019. (kjn)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re #55 Memorandum Opinion and Order - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The motion to substitute (Doc. #19 ) filed by 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its individual capacity by solely as Certificate Trustee, is GRANTED and this entity shall be substituted as a party in place of Federal National Mortgage Association; and 2. The caption of this action shall be amended to reflect that 1900 Capital is the plaintiff and Mr. Boldrini is the defendant. 3. Boldrinis Motion to Object to Substitution (Doc. 60) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on October 24, 2019. (kjn)
October 24, 2019 Filing 58 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #12 MOTION to Remand filed by 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association - IT IS RECOMMENDED that the Plaintiffs motion to remand (Doc. 12) be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 11/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on October 24, 2019. (kjn)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #38 MOTION From Orders Pursuant to Rule 60(b) for Fraud in the Court filed by Antonello Boldrini. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on October 24, 2019. (kjn)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #34 MOTION to Disqualify Judge filed by Antonello Boldrini. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on October 24, 2019. (kjn)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #19 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its Individual Capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee.Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on October 24, 2019. (kjn)
October 23, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION For Preliminary Objection to Doc. 19) by Antonello Boldrini. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Certificate of Service)(ga)
October 23, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION For Preliminary Objection To Motion to Remand (Doc. 12) by Antonello Boldrini. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Certificate of Service)(ga)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying #53 Motion to vacate all orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on October 23, 2019. (kjn)
October 22, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION To Object And Be Vacated Every Order Made In this Docket by Antonello Boldrini.(ga)
October 22, 2019 Filing 52 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #19 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Antonello Boldrini. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2)(ga)
October 22, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: In order to preserve all parties' first free look in PACER, Notice of Electronic Notification re-issued for #49 Motion for Extension of Time as Clerk's Office added the filed exhibits after it was docketed. (ep)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying #49 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Boldrini is ordered to file all responsive pleadings no later than October 23, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on October 22, 2019. (kjn)
October 21, 2019 Filing 50 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #49 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its Individual Capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee.(Shavel, Michael)
October 21, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objection and Reconsideration to Magistrate Judge Carlson's Order #7 dated 9/16/19; by Antonello Boldrini.(ep) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/22/2019: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10) (ep).
October 18, 2019 Filing 48 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #22 MOTION for Reconsideration re #15 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Motion and R&R Dealines/Hearings filed by Antonello Boldrini.(ep)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that discovery is stayed, and deferred pending resolution of the pending motion to remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on October 18, 2019. (kjn)
October 17, 2019 Filing 46 Praecipe and Notice to the Court of Identity Theft in his Credit Report RE This Action. (ga) Modified on 10/21/2019 (ep).
October 17, 2019 Filing 45 EMERGENCY REQUEST for Original Copy of Allegeds 12/29/15 Assignments and Alleged Notes by Antonello Boldrini. (ga) Modified on 10/21/2019 (ep).
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying #40 MOTION for Extension of Time to to file Reply Brief to Doc.20 "Brief in Opposition to Doc. 17 Motion to Strike Non Parties filed by Antonello Boldrini, #41 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief to #19 MOTION to Substitute Party filed filed by Antonello Boldrini. Boldrini is ordered to file all responsive pleadings nolater than October 23, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on October 17, 2019. (kjn)
October 17, 2019 Filing 43 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #41 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief to #19 MOTION to Substitute Party filed filed by 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its Individual Capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee.(Shavel, Michael)
October 16, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEAL in NON-PRISONER Case as to #29 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Set Motion and R&R Dealines/Hearings, #7 Order,,, Set Deadlines,, #15 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Set Motion and R&R Dealines/Hearings, #33 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Set Motion and R&R Dealines/Hearings, #25 Order,,, Set Motion and R&R Dealines/Hearings,,, Terminate Motions,, #35 Memorandum (Order to follow as separate docket entry),, Terminate Motions by Antonello Boldrini. Filing Fee and Docket Fee NOT PAID. Filing fee $ 505 The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (ga)
October 16, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief in Opposition to #19 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Antonello Boldrini.(ga)
October 16, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief to Doc.20 "Brief in Opposition to Doc. 17 Motion to Strike Non Parties by Antonello Boldrini.(ga)
October 16, 2019 Filing 39 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #38 MOTION From Orders Pursuant to Rule 60(b) for Fraud in the Court filed by 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its Individual Capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee.(Shavel, Michael)
October 15, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION From Orders Pursuant to Rule 60(b) for Fraud in the Court by Antonello Boldrini.(kpf)
October 15, 2019 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Antonello Boldrini re #26 Praecipe (kpf)
October 10, 2019 Filing 36 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #34 MOTION to Disqualify Judge filed by 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its Individual Capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee.(Shavel, Michael)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #17 MOTION to Strike filed by Antonello Boldrini. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on October 10, 2019. (kjn)
October 10, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Disqualification of Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson by Antonello Boldrini.(ga)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting in part #31 MOTION for Extension of Time to To File respones to Motion to Substitute #19 . Boldrini shall respond to this motion no later than October 23, 2019. No further extensions will be granted absent compelling circumstances. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on October 10, 2019. (kjn)
October 9, 2019 Filing 32 OBJECTION To Michael J. Shavel's "Certificate of Non-Concurrence" by Antonello Boldrini. to #19 MOTION to Substitute Party. (ga)
October 9, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion For Objection Michael J. Shavle (Doc.19) Motion To Substitute Plaintiff by Antonello Boldrini.(ga)
October 9, 2019 Filing 30 OBJECTION Or Non Consent to Reassignment to Honorable Judge Robert D.Mariani by Antonello Boldrini.. (ga)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 MOTION for Extension of Time to To File Objection To Fraudulent Motion For Remand (Doc.12) filed by Antonello Boldrini. Boldrini shall respond to this motion to remand no later than October 23, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on October 9, 2019. (kjn)
October 8, 2019 Filing 28 Praecipe To File Evidences as to Cancelled Deeds and Cancelled Liens Document Filed on the Register Office of Luzerne County on June 27, 2018 of 150 Pages Instrument#201834022 Book: 3018 Page 117166. (Attachments: #1 Part Two, #2 Part Three, #3 Part Four)(ga)
October 8, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Objection To Fraudulent Motion For Remand (Doc.12) by Antonello Boldrini.(ga)
October 8, 2019 Filing 26 Praecipe To File State Docket 2016-3597, filed by Antonello Boldrini. (ga)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #22 MOTION for Reconsideration re #15 Order. Our prior order is VACATED, (Doc. 15) and Boldrini shall file his objections to our service order (Doc. 7) no later than November 4, 2019. In the meanwhile, Boldrini is placed on notice that the court reserves the right to act upon the other pending motions in this case. On this score, we further advise Boldrini that he has not responded to the motion to remand filed in this case, and the deadline for response is October 8, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on October 8, 2019. (kjn)
October 7, 2019 Filing 24 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #22 MOTION for Reconsideration re #15 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Motion and R&R Dealines/Hearings filed by 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its Individual Capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Shavel, Michael)
October 4, 2019 Filing 23 Praecipe To File Boldrini's Email Copy Sent to the Court and Application as Answer to NOT CONSENT the Assignment of this Proceeding to Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson. (ga) Modified on 10/7/2019 (ga).
October 4, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Reconsideration and to VACATE Magistrate Judge Carlson's Order (Doc. #15 ) re #13 Motion to Object and for Reconsideration by Antonello Boldrini.(ga) Modified on 10/7/2019 (ga). Modified on 10/7/2019 (ep).
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order VERBAL ORDER by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner - Case Reassigned to Honorable Robert D. Mariani and referred to Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson as one or more parties have not consented to the jurisdiction of a U.S. Magistrate Judge. (jw)
October 3, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its Individual Capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee re #20 Brief in Opposition, (Shavel, Michael)
October 2, 2019 Filing 20 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #17 MOTION to Strike Opposition to Motion to Strike Non Parties filed by 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its Individual Capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee.(Shavel, Michael)
October 2, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Substitute Party by 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its Individual Capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Brief, #3 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(Shavel, Michael)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 VACATED PER ORDER OF 10/8/2019 - ORDER granting #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Motion for Remand filed by Antonello Boldrini. Boldrini shall respond no later than November 4, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on October 2, 2019. (kjn) Modified on 10/8/2019 (kjn).
October 1, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Antonello Boldrini re #17 MOTION to Strike, #16 Brief in Support (kpf)
October 1, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Strike Non Parties and Its Doc #12 by Antonello Boldrini.(kpf) Modified on 10/2/2019 (kpf).
October 1, 2019 Filing 16 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #17 MOTION to Strike filed by Antonello Boldrini.(kpf) Modified on 10/2/2019 (kpf).
October 1, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its Individual Capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee, Antonello Boldrini, Federal National Mortgage Association "Fannie Mae" YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 10/31/2019. (kjn)
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objection and Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge Carlson Order #7 Dated on 9/16/19; by Antonello Boldrini.(ep)
September 30, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Original document was incorrect due to clerical error. Doc #9 attachment replaced. (kpf)
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its Individual Capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Shavel, Michael)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 Praecipe TO FILE Docket case 3:18-CV-1360 by Antonello Boldrini. Modified on 9/23/2019 (kpf).
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Antonello Boldrini. Federal National Mortgage Association "Fannie Mae" served on 9/17/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (ao)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 PRAECIPE TO FILE Docket Case 3:11-cv-1771- by Antonello Boldrini. (ao) (Main Document 9 replaced on 9/30/2019) (kpf).
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 PRAECIPE TO FILE Docket Case 3:18-cv-2313 by Antonello Boldrini. (ao)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that a copy of this removal petition be served upon counsel for the plaintiff in the underlying state court action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if the state court plaintiff believes that this Notice of Removal is procedurally or substantively flawed, it will file a motion to dismiss or remand this action to state court on or before September 30, 2019. Boldrini shall respond no later than October 14, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on September 16, 2019. (kjn)
September 13, 2019 Receipt of payment from ANTONELLO BOLDRINI in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE. Transaction posted on 9/12/2019. Receipt number 333067506 processed by gangeli. (jjs)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 Praecipe To File Letter Dated December 12, 2018 from J. Blewitt, Jr.. (ga)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 Praecipe To File Docket Case 3:17-cv-2357. (ga)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Praecipe To File Docket RICO Case 3:19-cv-563. (ga)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Antonello Boldrini (ga)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Antonello Boldrini (ga)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT against Federal National Mortgage Association "Fannie Mae" ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 333067506), filed by Antonello Boldrini. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Exhibit(s) 3, #5 Exhibit(s) 4, #6 Exhibit(s) 5, #7 Exhibit(s) 6, #8 Exhibit(s) 7, #9 Exhibit(s) 8)(ga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, successor in interest to Federal National Mortgage Association v. Antonello Boldrini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association "Fannie Mae"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonello Boldrini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its Individual Capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee
Represented By: Michael J. Shavel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?