Poltorak v. Progressive Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Claudia Poltorak
Defendant: Progressive Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01579
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order approving #7 Stipulation. Count II of Plainitff's Complaint is dismissed, without prejudice. Defendant's pending Motion to Dismiss and Brief in Support are withdrawn as moot. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 11/1/19. (jam)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company.(LeVan, Jennifer)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company. (Dapper, Kathleen)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. LeVan on behalf of Progressive Specialty Insurance Company. (LeVan, Jennifer)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company.(Dapper, Kathleen)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dapper, Kathleen)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 9/13/19. (jam)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for Progressive Specialty Insurance Company. (ep)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company from Luzerne County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-10260. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-4869395), filed by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original Luzerne County Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poltorak v. Progressive Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel J. Twilla
Represented By: Kathleen P Dapper
Represented By: Jennifer L. LeVan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Poltorak
Represented By: Brian C. Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?