United States of America v. Darvell
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Steven Darvell
Case Number: 3:2019cv01762
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 42:1471
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Steven Darvell.Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/6/2019. (bg)
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Non-Military Service filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Solarz, Rebecca)
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Steven Darvell filed by United States of America.(Solarz, Rebecca)
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Steven Darvell by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order 1, #2 Exhibit(s) A)(Solarz, Rebecca)
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Solarz, Rebecca)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Steven Darvell served on 11/11/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Solarz, Rebecca)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 STATUS REPORT by United States of America. (Solarz, Rebecca)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. You are directed to file a written report within 30 days as to whether service has been effected or a waiver of service obtained. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 10/15/19. (jam)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Steven Darvell and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (bg)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Steven Darvell, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A - D)(bg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Darvell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Darvell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Solarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?