Kolmar Korea Co., Ltd. v. Process Technologies and Packaging, LLC
Plaintiff: Kolmar Korea Co., Ltd.
Defendant: Process Technologies and Packaging, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01843
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: James M Munley
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Extend Time to respond to m/to strike- due 1/6/20Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 12/9/19 (sm)
December 6, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer (ECF No. 9) by Lard-PT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Pizzi, Peter)
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #9 MOTION to Strike filed by Kolmar Korea Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Bonekemper, Andrew)
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Strike by Kolmar Korea Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Bonekemper, Andrew)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint ANSWER OF PROCESS TECHNOLOGIES AND PACKAGING, LLC, DERIVATIVELY FILED BY LARD-PT, LLC (UNREDACTED) by Lard-PT, LLC.(Pizzi, Peter)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Peter J. Pizzi to the Hon. James M. Munley re: Redactions to Answer . (Pizzi, Peter)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lard-PT, LLC, Process Technologies and Packaging, LLC. (Pizzi, Peter)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint ANSWER OF PROCESS TECHNOLOGIES AND PACKAGING, LLC, DERIVATIVELY FILED BY LARD-PT, LLC (REDACTED) by Lard-PT, LLC.(Pizzi, Peter)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Rule 7.1 Disclosure served on Ellie Stivala at Process Technologies and Packaging, LLC on 10/25/2019, filed by Kolmar Korea Co., Ltd.. (Bonekemper, Andrew)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Kolmar Korea Co., Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Kolmar Korea Holdings Co., Ltd. for Kolmar Korea Co., Ltd.. (Bonekemper, Andrew)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Process Technologies and Packaging, LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ao)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Process Technologies and Packaging, LLC ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4909316), filed by Kolmar Korea Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kolmar Korea Co., Ltd. v. Process Technologies and Packaging, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Process Technologies and Packaging, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kolmar Korea Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Andrew W. Bonekemper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?