Paul et al v. Wyoming Valley West School District
Plaintiff: Christi Paul and Nayree Paul
Defendant: Wyoming Valley West School District
Not Yet Classified: Mediator
Case Number: 3:2019cv01886
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by Wyoming Valley West School District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Service)(McPartland, William)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/16/2020. Fact Discovery due by 8/31/2020. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 10/2/2020. Defendant Expert Report is due by 10/30/2020. Supplemental due by 11/30/2020. Expert Discovery Deadline is due by 12/1/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 1/2/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 12/1/2020. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 12/6/19. (bs)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Joseph Anthony Barrett for Mediator added.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 12/6/19. (bs)
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued (Amended Complaint filed) as to Wyoming Valley West School District and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ep)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Presently before the court is plaintiffs amended complaint. (Doc. 10). Based upon this filing, the defendants motion to dismiss (Doc. 2) is DISMISSED without prejudice.dismissing #2 .Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 12/5/19 (bs)
December 5, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wyoming Valley West School District, filed by Christi Paul, Nayree Paul. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Conaboy, James)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 pltf's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Brief in Opposition due by 12/20/2019.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/26/19 (bs)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN JOINT by Christi Paul, Nayree Paul. (Conaboy, James)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief to #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Christi Paul, Nayree Paul. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Concurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Conaboy, James)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wyoming Valley West School District.(Kozlowski, Mark)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Joseph Kozlowski on behalf of Wyoming Valley West School District (Kozlowski, Mark)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2019 10:30 AM before Honorable Malachy E Mannion.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/6/19. (bs)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/4/19. (bs)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wyoming Valley West School District. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Service)(McPartland, William)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wyoming Valley West School District from Court of Common Pleas of Luzerne County, case number 2019-CV-07564. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 4913805), filed by Wyoming Valley West School District. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Certificate of Service)(kpf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paul et al v. Wyoming Valley West School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christi Paul
Represented By: James J. Conaboy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nayree Paul
Represented By: James J. Conaboy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyoming Valley West School District
Represented By: William J. McPartland
Represented By: Mark Joseph Kozlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Mediator
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?