Hammonds v. Luzerne County et al
Plaintiff: Rasheda Hammonds
Defendant: Wellpath, LLC, David McDermott, Joseph Katra, C.O. Karavitch, Nicholas Pokrinchak, C.O. Beckley, Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Lieutenant Francis Hacken, James Brawley, Mark Weiss, C.O. McClosky, Phil Levandowski, James Gilhooley, William Allen, John White, Kristopher Renfer, C.O. McCafferty, Thomas Shipp, Luzerne County and Sgt. Stofko
Case Number: 3:2019cv02199
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: James M Munley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER:Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2020 11:30 AM in Scranton before Honorable James M. Munley.Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 2/3/20. (sm)
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 STANDING ORDER #1Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 2/3/20. (sm)
January 28, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by James Brawley, C.O. Beckley, C.O. Karavitch, C.O. McCafferty, C.O. McClosky, James Gilhooley, Francis Hacken, Joseph Katra, Phil Levandowski, Luzerne County, David McDermott, Nicholas Pokrinchak, Kristopher Renfer, Sgt. Stofko, Thomas Shipp, Mark Weiss, John White.(McDonough, Sean)
January 24, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Wellpath, LLC.(Merlini, Mark)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Luzerne County's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer answer due 1/24/20. Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 1/13/20 (sm)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,, to Plaintiff's Complaint by William Allen, James Brawley, C.O. Beckley, C.O. Karavitch, C.O. McCafferty, C.O. McClosky, James Gilhooley, Francis Hacken, Joseph Katra, Phil Levandowski, Luzerne County, David McDermott, Nicholas Pokrinchak, Kristopher Renfer, Sgt. Stofko, Thomas Shipp, Mark Weiss, John White. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McDonough, Sean)
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 Consent to Removal from State Court to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1446(b)(2)(A) by Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Wellpath, LLC. . (Merlini, Mark)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nicholas Pokrinchak, C.O. McCafferty, Joseph Katra, Francis Hacken, David McDermott, James Gilhooley, Kristopher Renfer, C.O. McClosky, John White, Agt. Stofko, C.O. Beckley, James Brawley, C.O. Karavitch, Mark Weiss, Luzerne County, Thomas Shipp, Phil Levandowski, William Allen from Court of Common Pleas of Luzerne County, case number 2018-12116. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 4963295), filed by Nicholas Pokrinchak, C.O. McCafferty, Joseph Katra, Francis Hacken, David McDermott, James Gilhooley, Kristopher Renfer, C.O. McClosky, John White, Agt. Stofko, C.O. Beckley, James Brawley, C.O. Karavitch, Mark Weiss, Luzerne County, Thomas Shipp, Phil Levandowski, William Allen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s))(kpf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammonds v. Luzerne County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath, LLC
Represented By: Mark P. Merlini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David McDermott
Represented By: Sean P. McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Katra
Represented By: Sean P. McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Karavitch
Represented By: Sean P. McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Pokrinchak
Represented By: Sean P. McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Beckley
Represented By: Sean P. McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Mark P. Merlini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Francis Hacken
Represented By: Sean P. McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Brawley
Represented By: Sean P. McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Weiss
Represented By: Sean P. McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. McClosky
Represented By: Sean P. McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Levandowski
Represented By: Sean P. McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gilhooley
Represented By: Sean P. McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Allen
Represented By: Sean P. McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John White
Represented By: Sean P. McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristopher Renfer
Represented By: Sean P. McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. McCafferty
Represented By: Sean P. McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Shipp
Represented By: Sean P. McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luzerne County
Represented By: Sean P. McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Stofko
Represented By: Sean P. McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rasheda Hammonds
Represented By: Theron J Solomon
Represented By: Barry H. Dyller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?