United States of America et al v. Haber
Plaintiff: Revenue Officer Cynthia Topoleski and United States of America
Defendant: John J. Haber
Case Number: 3:2019mc00521
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TERMINATING CASE The court has received the governments praecipe to withdraw the complaint to enforce the Internal Revenue Summons filed in the above matter. Since the defendant has complied with the requirements of the Summons the show cause hearing scheduled for October 9, 2019 is CANCELLED.The clerk is directed to close this case.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/8/19. (bs)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of of Complience by United States of America re #1 Miscellaneous Case Filed 08/16/2019. (Simpson, D.)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 Certification of Service Of Court Order, filed by United States of America.(Simpson, D.)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Doc. #2 - "Insufficient Address, Needs Suite #" Mail sent to John Haber (Updated address and remailed) (ga)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Hearing set for 10/9/2019 01:30 PM in Scranton before Honorable Malachy E Mannion.IRS shall serve a copy of order, complaint and exhibits upon deft. before 9/13/19.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 8/28/19. (bs)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE FILED, filed by United States of America, Cynthia Topoleski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s))(ao) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/20/2019) (bs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Haber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Revenue Officer Cynthia Topoleski
Represented By: D. Brian Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: D. Brian Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J. Haber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?