SUTTER et al v. CASCADES TISSUE GROUP - PENNSYLVANIA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: GLEN SUTTER and SHIRLEY SUTTER
Defendant: CASCADES HOLDING US, INC., PLAINWELL, INC., Cascades Tissue Group - Pennsylvania, Inc., Pope & Talbot, Inc., CASCADES TISSUE, LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. and Pope & Talbot WIS, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00182
Filed: February 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: James M Munley
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Filing 28 Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-02201 containing electronic documents.
February 3, 2020 Original record transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania - Scranton Division via interdistrict transfer system. (md) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/3/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 27 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re #26 Transcript - PDF, 1/15/20 Entered and Copies Emailed and Mailed.. (rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/3/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 26 TRANSCRIPT of Pretrial Conference held on 12/13/19, before Judge 1/15/20. Court Reporter/Transcriber GAIL DRUMMOND. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/5/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/18/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/14/2020. (rf, ) Modified on 1/15/2020 (rf, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/3/2020.]
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER THAT THE #20 MOTION TO TRANSFER IS GRANTED AND THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED ACTION IS HEREBY TRANSFERRED TO THE US DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA-SCRANTON DIVISION.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/2/2020.1/3/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/3/2020.]
December 26, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION to Transfer Action to MDPA filed by GLEN SUTTER, SHIRLEY SUTTER. (SHEIN, BENJAMIN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/3/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN P. KOPESKY on behalf of GLEN SUTTER, SHIRLEY SUTTER with Certificate of Service(KOPESKY, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/3/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER THAT EXPERT DISCOVERY DUE BY 8/17/2020., MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 9/18/2020. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 12/13/19. 12/19/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/3/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER Pretrial Conference held on 12/13/19. (rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/3/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Transfer Action to MDPA filed by CASCADES TISSUE GROUP - PENNSYLVANIA, INC..Brief, Certificate of Service.Motions referred to THOMAS J. RUETER. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A)(MCSHEA, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/3/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 19 STATUS REPORT and Scheduling Report by GLEN SUTTER, SHIRLEY SUTTER. (SHEIN, BENJAMIN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/3/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 18 Statement Plaintiffs' (Redacted) Submission in Accordance with MDL 875 Administrative Order No. 12 by SHIRLEY SUTTER. (SHEIN, BENJAMIN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/3/2020.]
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/13/2019 09:00 AM. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 11/15/19. 11/18/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/3/2020.]
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER THAT THE COURT REFERS THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED ACTION PENDING IN MDL 875 TO THE HON. MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER FOR PROCEEDINGS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/13/19. 11/14/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED. (fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/3/2020.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by JOSEPH CAGNOLI, JR on behalf of CASCADES TISSUE GROUP - PENNSYLVANIA, INC.(CAGNOLI, JOSEPH) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/3/2020.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 14 SURREPLY OF DEFENDANT, CASCADES TISSUE GROUP PENNSYLVANIA, A DIVISION OF CASCADES HOLDING US INC., TO PLAINTIFFS'MOTION TO REMAND, EXHIBT by CASCADES TISSUE GROUP - PENNSYLVANIA, INC.. (rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/3/2020.]
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SURREPLY (DOC. 8) IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND (DOC. 5) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/3/19. 9/4/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/3/2020.]
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JOHN M. FITZPATRICK IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/28/19. 8/29/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/3/2020.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John M. Fitzpatrick by CASCADES TISSUE GROUP - PENNSYLVANIA, INC... (MCSHEA, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/3/2020.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN P. MCSHEA on behalf of CASCADES TISSUE GROUP - PENNSYLVANIA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MCSHEA, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/3/2020.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (nd, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/3/2020.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File A Surreply to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by CASCADES TISSUE GROUP - PENNSYLVANIA, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(CAGNOLI, JOSEPH) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/3/2020.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by GLEN SUTTER, SHIRLEY SUTTER. (SHEIN, BENJAMIN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/3/2020.]
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CASCADES TISSUE GROUP - PENNSYLVANIA, INC.. (MCNAMEE, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/3/2020.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by SHIRLEY SUTTER, GLEN SUTTER, Brief.(SHEIN, BENJAMIN) Modified on 6/11/2019 (md). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/3/2020.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of John P. Kopesky by BENJAMIN P. SHEIN on behalf of SHIRLEY SUTTER, GLEN SUTTER. (SHEIN, BENJAMIN) Modified on 6/11/2019 (md). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/3/2020.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN P. SHEIN on behalf of SHIRLEY SUTTER, GLEN SUTTER. (SHEIN, BENJAMIN) Modified on 6/11/2019 (md). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/3/2020.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent CASCADES USA INC., Corporate Parent LONGHORN PAPER PACKAGING LLC, Corporate Parent BEST DIAMOND PACKAGING LLC for CASCADES TISSUE GROUP - PENNSYLVANIA, INC.. with Certificate of Service by CASCADES TISSUE GROUP - PENNSYLVANIA, INC..(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/3/2020.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal filed by CASCADES TISSUE GROUP - PENNSYLVANIA, INC. from Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas, case number 170901560. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE197679)(mbh, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/24/2019: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit) (md, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/3/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SUTTER et al v. CASCADES TISSUE GROUP - PENNSYLVANIA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CASCADES HOLDING US, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLAINWELL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cascades Tissue Group - Pennsylvania, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Cagnoli, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory M McNamee
Represented By: JOHN M. FITZPATRICK
Represented By: John P. McShea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pope & Talbot, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CASCADES TISSUE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pope & Talbot WIS, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLEN SUTTER
Represented By: John P. Kopesky
Represented By: BENJAMIN P. SHEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHIRLEY SUTTER
Represented By: John P. Kopesky
Represented By: BENJAMIN P. SHEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?