Noss v. Allstate Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Phillip Noss
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Not Classified By Court: Mediator
Case Number: 3:2020cv00353
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: James M Munley
Referring Judge: Joseph F Saporito
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Joseph Anthony Barrett,Joseph Anthony Barrett for Mediator added.Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 4/27/20. (ms)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/25/2020. Discovery due by 9/24/2020. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 9/24/2020. Defendant Expert Report is due by 10/24/2020. Supplementations due 11/8/20. Joinder of Parties due by 5/25/2020. Motions due by 10/24/2020.Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 4/27/20. (ms)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: TELEPHONIC Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2020 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito Jr. Counsel to access the conference via information provided in Order. Attached scheduling order to be completed and provided to Chambers 3 business days prior to conference.Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 4/16/20. (ms)
April 15, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Approved. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Saporito. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 4/15/2020. (jr)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the initial case management conference call scheduled for 4/24/2020, at 12:00 p.m., is CANCELLED pursuant to the parties notice of consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 4/15/2020. (jr)
April 14, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION to jurisdiction by Phillip Noss. (Daly, Kane)
April 14, 2020 Filing 7 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. (Daly, Kane) Modified on 4/15/2020 (lg).
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 4/24/2020 at 12:00 PM before Honorable Matthew W. Brann. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 4/1/2020. (jr)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order VERBAL ORDER by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner - Case Reassigned to Honorable Matthew W. Brann. (cd)
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaime L Wertz on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company (Wertz, Jaime)
March 10, 2020 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Insurance Company.(Wertz, Jaime)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 3/3/20. (sm)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Allstate Insurance Company and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (kpf)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allstate Insurance Company (Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 5022750), filed by Phillip Noss. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kpf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noss v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Jaime L Wertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Noss
Represented By: Kane Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Mediator
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?