Karlowicz v. American States Insurance Company
Plaintiff: James Karlowicz
Defendant: American States Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00488
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order approving re #12 Stipulation. See Order for details. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 5/22/20. (jam)
May 22, 2020 Filing 13 Letter from Ryan M. Molitoris, Esquire re: Joint Case Management Conference. (Lombardo, Michael)
May 21, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Correct Name of Defendant by American States Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Alford, Brigid)
May 21, 2020 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN Joint by James Karlowicz. (Molitoris, Ryan)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference VIA TELEPHONE set for 5/28/2020 11:40 AM. The telephone conference call is the responsibility of the plaintiff(s). At least three days prior to the Case Management Conference, counsel for the plaintiff(s) shall provide the court, via e-filing, a call-in number which the court and counsel for all parties of record may call to connect to the conference call. The completed Joint Case Management Plan must be filed at least three (3) days prior to the Case Management Conference. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 5/20/20. (jam)
April 29, 2020 Filing 9 REPLY BRIEF re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II, III and IV of Complaint filed by American States Insurance Company.(Alford, Brigid)
April 20, 2020 Filing 8 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II, III and IV of Complaint filed by James Karlowicz.(Molitoris, Ryan)
April 7, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II, III and IV of Complaint filed by American States Insurance Company.(Alford, Brigid)
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II, III and IV of Complaint by American States Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Alford, Brigid)
April 3, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE REPORT by James Karlowicz by James Karlowicz.(Molitoris, Ryan)
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 3/27/20. (jam)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by American States Insurance Company. (Alford, Brigid)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 EXHIBITS by American States Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3)(ao)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American States Insurance Company from Court of Common Pleas of Luzerne County, case number 2020-04003. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-5046184), filed by American States Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karlowicz v. American States Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American States Insurance Company
Represented By: Brigid Q. Alford
Represented By: Christopher W Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Karlowicz
Represented By: Michael A. Lombardo, III
Represented By: Ryan M. Molitoris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?