Marino v. Howard
Petitioner: Vincent Michael Marino
Respondent: Warden Howard
Case Number: 3:2020cv01456
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: DB
Referring Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Order of Court by Vincent Michael Marino.(ao)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TERMINATING CASE for failure to pay the filing fee or file proper forms.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/2/20.. (bs)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST dtd 9/23/20 for copy of docket sheet and status of case by Vincent Michael Marino. (ao)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST dtd 9/16/20 for copy of docket sheet by Vincent Michael Marino. (ao)
August 28, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Docket sheet sent to Pltf. (ao)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST dtd 8/25/20 for copy of docket sheet by Vincent Michael Marino. (ao)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the petitioner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 08/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP (habeas corpus))(lp)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for (DHO) Rehearing or Expungement to prove actual innocence of possession of cellphone and sharpened nail which was PLANTED on Marino. by Vincent Michael Marino.(lp)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Marino's Notice to Court Requesting Permission to Pay $5.00 Court Filing Fee Within Two Weeks and to Notify This Court to Allow This 28 U.S.C. 2241 to Be Separate From his Previous Pending 2241's To Not Confuse This Court or Respondents by Vincent Michael Marino.. (lp)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Vincent Michael Marino.(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marino v. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vincent Michael Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?