Gorbey v. Spaulding et al
Plaintiff: Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey
Defendant: United States and S. Spaulding
Case Number: 3:2020cv01457
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CA
Referring Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 16 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey. (kpf)
September 25, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, including certification, by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey. (kpf) Modified on 10/8/2020 (lp).
September 25, 2020 Filing 14 Continuance Page to Support Imminent Danger by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey. (kpf)
September 17, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Doc. 15 mailed to Warden on 9/17/2020 (bg)
September 17, 2020 Filing 13 15 DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER TO WARDEN.Issued on 9/17/2020. (bg)
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #11 MOTION Omnibus filed by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey. (kpf)
September 4, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION Omnibus by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey. (kpf)
September 4, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey. (kpf)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend Joint #1 Complaint Bivens Action by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey. (kpf)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint filed by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey. (kpf)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey. (kpf)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION for Recusal of Judge Mariani filed by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey. (kpf)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Recusal of Judge Mariani by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey. (kpf)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed.Signed by LP on 08/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 Instruction Sheet, #3 Federal & Local Rules, #4 398 Form, #5 399 Form) (lp)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Application to proceed in forma pauperis (incorrect form for civil right cases).. (lp)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT "Owl-Feather-Gorbey Bivens-Federal Tort Claim Act lawsuit Under Imminent Danger against S. Spaulding, United States lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey.(lp) Modified on 8/18/2020 (lp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gorbey v. Spaulding et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Spaulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Owl-Feather Gorbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?