Snype v. Howard
Petitioner: Vernon Snype
Respondent: Catricia L. Howard
Case Number: 3:2020cv01478
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: DB
Referring Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (See order for details). Show Cause Response due by 10/19/2020.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 9/28/20. (bs)
September 28, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Docket sheet sent to Pltf. (ao)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 Letter dtd 9/24/20 from Vernon Snype requesting copy of docket sheet and status of case. (ao)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement showing $5.00 filing fee decuction filed by Vernon Snype. (bg)
August 25, 2020 Receipt of payment from VERNON SNYPE in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 8/24/2020. Receipt number 333072674 processed by gangeli. (jjs)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the petitioner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 08/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP (habeas corpus))(lp)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Vernon Snype.(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snype v. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vernon Snype
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Catricia L. Howard
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?