Mountain Lakes Abstract Co. Inc. et al v. Lloyd's of London et al
Plaintiff: Thomas W. Fiers, Scott M. Marinelli, Jennifer J. Fiers and Mountain Lakes Abstract Co. Inc.
Defendant: Lloyd's of London
Counter Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Counter Defendant: Robert Casper
Case Number: 3:2020cv01484
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, And, COUNTERCLAIM against Jennifer J. Fiers, Thomas W. Fiers, Scott M. Marinelli, Mountain Lakes Abstract Co. Inc., Robert Casper by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 to Counterclaim, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 to Counterclaim, #3 Exhibit(s) 3 to Counterclaim, #4 Exhibit(s) 4 to Counterclaim, #5 Exhibit(s) 5 to Counterclaim)(Bertschi, Scott)
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Scott F. Bertschi. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 9/14/2020. (ktt)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Timothy Larsen. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 9/14/2020. (ktt)
September 14, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorneys' bar status verified. (ktt)
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Scott F. Bertschi on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Attorney Scott Bertschi is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5250828.. (Bertschi, Scott)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Timothy Larsen on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Attorney Timothy Larsen is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5250684.. (Larsen, Timothy)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London waiver sent on 8/20/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (McPartland, William)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. McPartland on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London (McPartland, William)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures - Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 8/20/2020. (ktt)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Lloyd's of London and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ep)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Lloyd's of London ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number APAMDC-5214168), filed by Thomas W. Fiers, Scott M. Marinelli, Mountain Lakes Abstract Co. Inc., Jennifer J. Fiers. (Attachments: #1 Exh A, #2 Exh B, #3 Exh C, #4 Exh D, #5 Exh E, #6 Exh F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mountain Lakes Abstract Co. Inc. et al v. Lloyd's of London et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas W. Fiers
Represented By: Gerald John Hanchulak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott M. Marinelli
Represented By: Gerald John Hanchulak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer J. Fiers
Represented By: Gerald John Hanchulak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountain Lakes Abstract Co. Inc.
Represented By: Gerald John Hanchulak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd's of London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Represented By: Scott F. Bertschi
Represented By: Timothy Larsen
Represented By: William J. McPartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Robert Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?