Conway et al v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Mark J. Conway, Michael C. Morris and Stephen G. Smith
Defendant: James L. Brennan, Jr., Tiffany S. Kominski, F. J. Monaghan, Scott J. Smith, Borough of Honesdale, Bill Canfield, Harry Derrieze, Juanita Pisano, Robert Jennings and Carolyn J. Lorent
Case Number: 3:2020cv01486
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 8 REPLY BRIEF re #6 MOTION to Remand with Certification of Compliance and Certificate of Service filed by Borough of Honesdale, James L. Brennan, Jr, Bill Canfield, Harry Derrieze, Robert Jennings, Tiffany S. Kominski, Carolyn J. Lorent, F. J. Monaghan, Juanita Pisano, Scott J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) EXHIBIT 1)(Sherr, Anthony)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Certificate of Non-Concurrence by Laura A. Feldman on behalf of Michael C. Morris (Feldman, Laura)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by Mark J. Conway. (Attachments: #1 Memo, #2 Proposed Order)(Feldman, Laura)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mark J. Conway. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I)(Feldman, Laura)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2020 11:45 AM before Chief Judge John E. Jones III. See attached court calendar for dates that MUST be utilized when you select a trial month in the JCMP. See order for call information. (eo)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT by Borough of Honesdale, James L. Brennan, Jr, Bill Canfield, Harry Derrieze, Robert Jennings, Tiffany S. Kominski, Carolyn J. Lorent, F. J. Monaghan, Juanita Pisano, Scott J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Memo OF LAW ISO MOTION TO DISMISS, #2 Affidavit OF SERVICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW ISO THEREOF, #3 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #4 Proposed Order)(Sherr, Anthony)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 EXHIBITS by Borough of Honesdale, James L. Brennan, Jr, Bill Canfield, Harry Derrieze, Robert Jennings, Tiffany S. Kominski, Carolyn J. Lorent, F. J. Monaghan, Juanita Pisano, Scott J. Smith re #1 Notice of Removal,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) cont., #2 Exhibit(s) cont.)(ao)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Borough of Honesdale, Harry Derrieze, F. J. Monaghan, Robert Jennings, James L. Brennan, Jr, Tiffany S. Kominski, Bill Canfield, Carolyn J. Lorent, Scott J. Smith, Juanita Pisano from Court of Common Pleas of Wayne County, case number 317-Civil-2015. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number APAMDC-5214678), filed by Borough of Honesdale, Harry Derrieze, F. J. Monaghan, Robert Jennings, James L. Brennan, Jr, Tiffany S. Kominski, Bill Canfield, Carolyn J. Lorent, Scott J. Smith, Juanita Pisano. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conway et al v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Brennan, Jr.
Represented By: Anthony R. Sherr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany S. Kominski
Represented By: Anthony R. Sherr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. J. Monaghan
Represented By: Anthony R. Sherr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott J. Smith
Represented By: Anthony R. Sherr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borough of Honesdale
Represented By: Anthony R. Sherr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Canfield
Represented By: Anthony R. Sherr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Derrieze
Represented By: Anthony R. Sherr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juanita Pisano
Represented By: Anthony R. Sherr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Jennings
Represented By: Anthony R. Sherr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn J. Lorent
Represented By: Anthony R. Sherr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark J. Conway
Represented By: Ronald M. Bugaj
Represented By: Laura A. Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael C. Morris
Represented By: Ronald M. Bugaj
Represented By: Laura A. Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen G. Smith
Represented By: Ronald M. Bugaj
Represented By: Laura A. Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?