Pieczynski v. Commonwealth Of Pennsylvania et al
Petitioner: Paul Pieczynski
Respondent: David W. Lupas, Stefanie J. Salavantis, Commonwealth Of Pennsylvania and Michael T. Vough
Case Number: 3:2020cv01502
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William I Arbuckle
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST to Confirm and Enforce Common Law Arbitration Award by Paul Pieczynski. (ao)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 Supplement by Paul Pieczynski. (ao)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) The Clerk of Court shall send Mr. Piecynski a copy of this Order and a printed copy of the docket sheet bearing the number of the civil case number assigned to his filing. (2) The $47.00 paid by Mr. Piecynski to initiate this miscellaneous action shall be credited towards the civil filing fee owed; (3) If Mr. Piecynski wishes to proceed, he must pay $353.00 the remaining balance of the filing fee owed-within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order; (4) If Mr. Piecynski is unable to pay the remaining balance of the filing fee owed, he should file a proper motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; and (5) Mr. Piecynski is placed on notice that failure to pay the required filing fee in full or file a proper motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis may result in the dismissal of his civil case. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 8/28/2020. (caw)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - ( Filing fee $47, Receipt Number 333072621), filed by Paul Pieczynski. Petition to Confirm and Enforce Common Law Arbitration Award by Way of Mandamus In Chambers Ex Parte; (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter to the Clerk with Table of Contents, #3 Final Arbitration Award, #4 Proposed order - award and three cards, #5 Proposed Order - returning surety, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Filing Fee Receipt)(ep) Modified on 8/21/2020 (jw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pieczynski v. Commonwealth Of Pennsylvania et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paul Pieczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David W. Lupas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stefanie J. Salavantis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Commonwealth Of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael T. Vough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?