Jones v. Valentin
Plaintiff: Stephen Jones
Defendant: Denise Valentin
Case Number: 3:2020cv01869
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Denise Valentin. (Gartner, Francis)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis R. Gartner on behalf of Denise Valentin (Gartner, Francis)
October 23, 2020 Filing 5 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Kevette B. Elliott.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/23/20. (bs)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/22/20. (bs)
October 21, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: For purposes of Special Admission to this Court, Atty Kevette Beard Elliott is listed as an active member of the bar for the Commonwealth of Virginia, with no disciplinary action (per Virginia State Bar online Lawyer Directory and search) (ep)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Erica R. Townes on behalf of Stephen Jones Attorney Kevette Elliott is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5295609., filed by on behalf of Stephen Jones.(Townes, Erica) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/22/2020: #1 Code of Professional Conduct) (bs).
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Denise Valentin and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ep)
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Denise Valentin ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number APAMDC-5291478), filed by Stephen Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Valentin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Jones
Represented By: Erica R. Townes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Valentin
Represented By: Francis R. Gartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?