WOLVERTON v. PADGETT-PATTERSON
Plaintiff: Louis John Wolverton
Defendant: Mia Gray Padgett-Patterson
Case Number: 3:2020cv01963
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-04499 containing electronic documents. (ao)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED THAT THIS MATTER IS TRANSFERREDTO THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 9/23/2020. 9/23/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO UNREP.(sg, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/23/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL SHOW CAUSE IN A MEMORANDUM NOT TO EXCEED SEVEN PAGES FILED ON OR BEFORE SEPTEMBER 22, 2020, EXPLAINING WHY VENUE LAYS IN THIS COURT AND WHY THE COURT SHOULD RETAIN VENUE AND NOT TRANSFER THIS MATTER TO THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA OR ANOTHER MORE APPROPRIATE VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404 AND/OR 1406. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 09/16/2020. 09/16/2020 ENTERED AND E-MAILED AND COPY MAILED TO UNREP. PARTY.(ja,) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/23/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint against MIA GRAY PADGETT-PATTERSON ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14564060.), filed by LOUIS JOHN WOLVERTON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(KOLMAN, TIMOTHY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/23/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WOLVERTON v. PADGETT-PATTERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis John Wolverton
Represented By: Timothy M. Kolman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mia Gray Padgett-Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?