Fox v. Berry et al
Plaintiff: Jacob Fox
Defendant: TPRSK, LLC and Kevin Berry
Case Number: 3:2020cv01998
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration by Kevin Berry, TPRSK, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit(s) Cert of Service)(Riegel, Brett)
November 25, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Jacob Fox. TPRSK, LLC waiver sent on 11/23/2020, answer due 1/22/2021. (Walters, Kathleen)
November 25, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Jacob Fox. Kevin Berry waiver sent on 11/23/2020, answer due 1/22/2021. (Walters, Kathleen)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. You are directed to file a written report within 30 days as to whether service has been effected or a waiver of service obtained. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 10/30/20. (jam)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kevin Berry, TPRSK, LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ao)
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kevin Berry, TPRSK, LLC ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number APAMDC-5318593), filed by Jacob Fox. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fox v. Berry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Fox
Represented By: Kathleen E. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPRSK, LLC
Represented By: Brett J. Riegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Berry
Represented By: Brett J. Riegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?