Skalde et al v. Lemieux Group, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Jarrod Skalde and Erin Skalde
Defendant: Lemieux Group, L.P., Pittsburgh Penguins, L.P and Clark Donatelli
Case Number: 3:2020cv02039
Filed: November 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Jennifer P Wilson
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been administratively closed pursuant to the Stipulation of Dismissal, Doc. 65, filed on 11/9/2021. (ve)
November 9, 2021 Filing 65 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Lemieux Group, L.P., Pittsburgh Penguins, L.P. (McGrogan, Mariah)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #59 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael D. Homans terminated. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 11/3/2021 (ve)
November 3, 2021 Filing 63 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to David J. Fish, Esq. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 11/3/2021. (ve)
November 3, 2021 Filing 62 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Charles G. Wentworth, Esq. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 11/3/2021. (ve)
November 3, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Both Petitioning Attorneys and Associate Counsel are in Good Standing. (gs)
November 2, 2021 Filing 61 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by James E. Goodley on behalf of Jarrod Skalde Attorney Charles Wentworth is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5743536.. (Goodley, James)
November 2, 2021 Filing 60 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by James E. Goodley on behalf of Jarrod Skalde Attorney David Fish is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5743527.. (Goodley, James)
October 11, 2021 Filing 59 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff by Jarrod Skalde. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Homans, Michael)
October 10, 2021 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by James E. Goodley on behalf of Jarrod Skalde (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Goodley, James)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER adopting in part and declining to adopt in part #54 Report and Recommendations. The parties shall have 90 days to conduct this limited discovery, with this limited fact discovery ending on December 29, 2021. Within 14 days after the close of this limited fact discovery period, on or before January 12, 2021, Defendants may file a renewed motion to compel arbitration which the court will review under the Rule 56 standard as set forth in Guidotti, 716 F.3d at 77476; Fed. R. Civ. P. 56. In the event that Defendants do not wish to file a renewed motion, they shall file a notice with the court indicating that they do not wish to renew their motion and requesting a status conference on or before January 12, 2021. See order for further details. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 9/30/2021 (ve)
July 12, 2021 Filing 56 REPLY BRIEF re #54 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Pittsburgh Penguins, L.P, Lemieux Group, L.P. filed by Lemieux Group, L.P., Pittsburgh Penguins, L.P.(McGrogan, Mariah)
June 28, 2021 Filing 55 OBJECTION to #54 Report and Recommendations . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Homans, Michael)
June 17, 2021 Filing 54 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - IT IS RECOMMENDED that motion to dismiss, or in the alternative, to compel arbitration of the plaintiffs claims against thePittsburgh Penguins hockey organization, (Doc. 19), be GRANTED as to Counts IIIand V of the amended complaint without prejudice to pursuit of these claims in the appropriate state court and the and the motion to compel arbitration of Count IV of the complaint be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 7/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on June 17, 2021. (kjn)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that further discovery is STAYED until June 28,2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on June 7, 2021. (kjn)
June 5, 2021 Filing 52 Emergency MOTION to Stay Discovery by Lemieux Group, L.P., Pittsburgh Penguins, L.P.(McGrogan, Mariah)
May 20, 2021 Filing 51 VERBAL ORDER - AND NOW, on this 20th day of May, 2021, IT IS ORDERED THAT the case management conference scheduled for 9:45 a.m. today is CANCELLED and will be rescheduled, if necessary, following the resolution of Defendants' motion to dismiss. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 5/20/2021. (Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order of the court or notice on the matter.) (ve)
May 19, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine S. Ryan on behalf of Lemieux Group, L.P., Pittsburgh Penguins, L.P (Ryan, Catherine)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER - In accordance with the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and given the pending and potentially dispositive motion filed in this case, IT IS ORDERED that, for the reasons set forth in the Memorandum Opinion, we will DENY what we deem to be the motion to compel (Doc. #45 ), GRANT, in part, what we deem to be the motion to stay, (Doc. #42 ), and STAY further discovery for 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on May 6, 2021. (kjn)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re Letter #45 deemed MOTION to Compel, Letter deemed #42 MOTION to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on May 6, 2021. (kjn)
May 6, 2021 Filing 47 VERBAL ORDER - AND NOW, on this 6th day of May, 2021, upon notification of a scheduling conflict, IT IS ORDERED THAT the case management conference scheduled for May 19, 2021 is CONTINUED to May 20, 2021, at 9:45 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call when all parties are on the line to chambers at (717) 221-3970. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 5/6/2021. (Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order of the court or notice on the matter.)(ve)
May 5, 2021 Filing 46 VERBAL ORDER - AND NOW, on this 5th day of May, 2021, IT IS ORDERED THAT the case management conference scheduled for May 12, 2021 is CONTINUED to May 19, 2021, at 11:15 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call when all parties are on the line to chambers at (717) 221-3970. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 5/5/2021. (Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order of the court or notice on the matter.) (ve)
April 29, 2021 Filing 45 Letter from Plaintiff in Response to Defendants' Discovery Dispute Letter of April 21, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Homans, Michael)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER re #42 Letter - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the plaintiffs shall file a response to the defendants letter request for a stay of discovery on or before April 29, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on April 22, 2021. (kjn)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER - AND NOW, on this 22nd day of April, 2021, following review of Defendants discovery dispute letter, Doc. 42, IT IS ORDERED THAT this matter is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson for resolution. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 4/22/2021. (ve)
April 21, 2021 Filing 42 Letter from Pittsburgh Penguins LP and Lemieux Group LP . (Suddath, Thomas)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER adopting #33 Report and Recommendations. Counts I and II of Plaintiffs amended complaint, Doc. 16, are DISMISSED without prejudice to Plaintiffs pursuing these claims in the appropriate state court. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 4/7/2021 (ve)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James F. Glunt terminated. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 3/15/2021 (ve)
March 12, 2021 Filing 39 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel by Lemieux Group, L.P., Pittsburgh Penguins, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McGrogan, Mariah)
March 10, 2021 Filing 38 TEXT SCHEDULING ORDER - AND NOW, this 10th day of March, 2021, due to the pending report and recommendation, Doc. #33 , on the motion to dismiss, and the objection filed by certain defendants, Doc. #34 , the court RESCHEDULES the case management conference for this case to May 12, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiff shall provide the court and opposing counsel a call-in number with a pass-code at least two days prior to the call. Issued by Honorable the Jennifer P. Wilson on March 10, 2021. (kjn)
March 8, 2021 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lemieux Group, L.P.. (Suddath, Thomas)
March 8, 2021 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pittsburgh Penguins, L.P. (Suddath, Thomas)
March 4, 2021 Filing 35 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN (Joint) by Lemieux Group, L.P., Pittsburgh Penguins, L.P. (Suddath, Thomas)
March 2, 2021 Filing 34 OBJECTION to #33 Report and Recommendations . (Suddath, Thomas)
February 16, 2021 Filing 33 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - IT IS RECOMMENDED that the motion to dismissthe plaintiffs complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction (Doc. #18 ) beGRANTED without prejudice to pursuit of these claims in the appropriate statecourt. Objections to R&R due by 3/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on February 16, 2021. (kjn)
February 11, 2021 Filing 32 TEXT ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE CARLSON: #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Clark Donatelli, #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Pittsburgh Penguins, L.P, Lemieux Group, L.P. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 2/11/2021. (ve)
February 2, 2021 Filing 31 REPLY BRIEF re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Clark Donatelli. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brier, Daniel)
February 2, 2021 Filing 30 REPLY BRIEF re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Lemieux Group, L.P., Pittsburgh Penguins, L.P.(Suddath, Thomas)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lori E. Armstrong Halber terminated. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 2/2/2021 (ve)
February 1, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Lemieux Group, L.P., Pittsburgh Penguins, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Armstrong Halber, Lori)
January 19, 2021 Filing 27 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Erin Skalde, Jarrod Skalde. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Proposed Order)(Homans, Michael)
January 19, 2021 Filing 26 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Erin Skalde, Jarrod Skalde. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Homans, Michael)
January 8, 2021 Filing 25 CIVIL PRACTICE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 1/8/2021. (ve)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT: The initial case management conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 will be conducted via telephone by the court on March 11, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiff shall provide the Court and opposing counsel a call-in number with a pass-code at least two days prior to the call. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 1/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Calendar 2020-2022, #2 Case Management Calendar 2022-2024)(ve)
January 4, 2021 Filing 23 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Clark Donatelli.(Brier, Daniel)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 1/4/21 (ve)
December 31, 2020 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to to respond to Motion to Dismiss by Erin Skalde, Jarrod Skalde. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Order)(Homans, Michael)
December 21, 2020 Filing 20 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Lemieux Group, L.P., Pittsburgh Penguins, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Armstrong Halber, Lori)
December 21, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Lemieux Group, L.P., Pittsburgh Penguins, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Armstrong Halber, Lori)
December 21, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Clark Donatelli. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brier, Daniel)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER- IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1) Defendants motion to dismiss the complaint, Doc. 9, is DENIED as moot and without prejudice. 2) Defendants shall respond to the amended complaint, Doc. 16, in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 12/9/2020 (ve)
December 7, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Erin Skalde, Jarrod Skalde.(Homans, Michael)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Extend Time. The deadline for Mr. Donatelli to answer, move or otherwise plead in response is extended until December 17, 2020. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 12/3/2020 (ve)
December 1, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Clark Donatelli. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brier, Daniel)
November 30, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne Conaboy on behalf of Clark Donatelli. (Conaboy, Suzanne)
November 30, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Donna A. Walsh on behalf of Clark Donatelli. (Walsh, Donna)
November 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel T. Brier on behalf of Clark Donatelli. (Brier, Daniel)
November 24, 2020 Filing 10 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Lemieux Group, L.P., Pittsburgh Penguins, L.P.(Armstrong Halber, Lori)
November 24, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is directed to file their brief to #9 Motion to Dismiss as a separate entry. Please do not re-file the motion. (ve)
November 23, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Lemieux Group, L.P., Pittsburgh Penguins, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Memo, #2 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #3 Proposed Order)(Armstrong Halber, Lori)
November 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas H. Suddath, Jr on behalf of Lemieux Group, L.P., Pittsburgh Penguins, L.P (Suddath, Thomas)
November 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori E. Armstrong Halber on behalf of Lemieux Group, L.P., Pittsburgh Penguins, L.P (Armstrong Halber, Lori)
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erin Skalde, Jarrod Skalde. Clark Donatelli served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. (Homans, Michael)
November 6, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Erin Skalde, Jarrod Skalde. Lemieux Group, L.P. waiver sent on 11/5/2020, answer due 1/4/2021; Pittsburgh Penguins, L.P waiver sent on 11/5/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Homans, Michael)
November 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Glunt on behalf of Lemieux Group, L.P., Pittsburgh Penguins, L.P (Glunt, James)
November 4, 2020 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson. (ve)
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Clark Donatelli, Lemieux Group, L.P., Pittsburgh Penguins, L.P and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ep)
November 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Clark Donatelli, Lemieux Group, L.P., Pittsburgh Penguins, L.P ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number APAMDC-5327908), filed by Erin Skalde, Jarrod Skalde. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skalde et al v. Lemieux Group, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarrod Skalde
Represented By: Michael D. Homans
Represented By: Charles G. Wentworth
Represented By: David Fish
Represented By: James E. Goodley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Skalde
Represented By: Michael D. Homans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lemieux Group, L.P.
Represented By: James F. Glunt
Represented By: Lori E. Armstrong Halber
Represented By: Thomas H. Suddath, Jr.
Represented By: Catherine S. Ryan
Represented By: Mariah H McGrogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pittsburgh Penguins, L.P
Represented By: James F. Glunt
Represented By: Lori E. Armstrong Halber
Represented By: Thomas H. Suddath, Jr.
Represented By: Catherine S. Ryan
Represented By: Mariah H McGrogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark Donatelli
Represented By: Donna A. Walsh
Represented By: Suzanne Conaboy
Represented By: Daniel T. Brier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?